blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0324279

EP0324279 - System for measuring fracture stiffness [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.07.1996
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.08.1996 [1996/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ORTHOFIX S.r.l.
Via Delle Nazioni, 9
37012 Bussolengo (VR) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1995/33]For all designated states
ORTHOFIX S.r.l.
9, Via Delle Nazioni (Z.I.)
I-37012 Bussolengo (VR) / IT
Former [1989/29]For all designated states
Richardson, James Bruce, Dr.
3 Whitmore Road
Newcastle-under-Lyme ST5 3LY / GB
For all designated states
Shah, Khalid Mahmud
Western Infirmary Dumbarton Road
Glasgow G11 6NT / GB
For all designated states
Roberts, Andrew
1 Black Lane
Pilsley Derbyshire S45 8HJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Richardson, James Bruce, Prof.
Westminster House, Old Chirk Road
Gobowen, Oswestry, Shropshire SY11 3LW / GB
02 / Roberts, Andrew, Dr.
The Robert Jones & Agnes Hunt Orthopaedic Hospital
Oswestry, Shropshire SY10 7AG / GB
03 / Shah, Khalid, Dr.
Flat 8/1 Dadabhoy Centre, Opposite Aisha Bawany
Academy Karachi 75500 / PK
[1995/26]
Former [1989/29]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/20]Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [1993/09]Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E.
Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Former [1989/29]Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E.
Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Application number, filing date88312388.729.12.1988
[1989/29]
Priority number, dateGB1987003025729.12.1987         Original published format: GB 8730257
[1989/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0324279
Date:19.07.1989
Language:EN
[1989/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0324279
Date:30.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.1989
ClassificationIPC:A61B5/103, A61B17/56
[1995/35]
CPC:
A61B5/4504 (EP); G01B7/16 (EP); A61B17/58 (EP)
Former IPC [1989/29]A61B5/10, A61B17/56
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1989/45]
Former [1989/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Messsystem für die Bruchsteifheit[1989/29]
English:System for measuring fracture stiffness[1989/29]
French:Système de mesure de la raideur de fracture[1989/29]
Examination procedure30.01.1989Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.06.1989Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, ES, GR, LU, NL
12.01.1990Examination requested  [1990/12]
16.11.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.06.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.10.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.1995Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
25.04.1995Fee for grant paid
25.04.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.05.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/34]
Request for further processing for:25.04.1995Request for further processing filed
25.04.1995Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.05.1995Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
07.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.04.1989AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.1989BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.1989ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.1989GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.1989LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.1989NL   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.01.199103   M06   Fee paid on   08.01.1991
01.01.199305   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.1993
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inExamination   - ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE vol. 16, no. 4, October 1987, pages 229-232, London, GB; J.L. CUNNINGHAM et al.: "The measurement of stiffness of fractures treated with external fixation".
    - ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE vol. 11, no. 3, July 1982, pages 123,124, Whitstable, GB; W.V. JAMES et al.: "A clinical electrogoniometry system".
    - JOURNAL A vol. 24, no. 3, July 1983, pages 139-153, Antwerpen, Belgium; R. VAN CAUTEREN:"(Unusual) sensors in (unusual) mechanical applications".
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.