Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0330787

EP0330787 - Navigation system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  02.07.1999
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AISIN AW CO., LTD.
10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi
Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP
For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA SHINSANGYOKAIHATSU
1-33-3, Hatagaya Shibuya-Ku
Tokyo 151 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1989/36]For all designated states
AISIN AW CO., LTD.
10, Takane Fujii-cho
Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP
For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA SHINSANGYOKAIHATSU
1-33-3, Hatagaya Shibuya-Ku
Tokyo 151 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Moroto, Shuzo
c/o Aisin Aw Co.,Ltd. 10, Takane Fujii-cho
Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP
02 / Kawai, Masao
c/o Aisin AW Co.,Ltd. 10, Takane Fujii-cho
Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP
03 / Yokoyama, Shoji
c/o Aisin AW Co.,Ltd. 10, Takane Fujii-cho
Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP
04 / Kobayashi, Koji
c/o Aisin AW Co.,Ltd. 10, Takane Fujii-cho
Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP
05 / Sumiya, Koji
c/o Aisin AW Co.,Ltd. 10, Takane Fujii-cho
Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP
[1989/36]
Representative(s)Kinne, Reinhard , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/44]Kinne, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Former [1989/36]Bubb, Antony John Allen , et al
GEE & CO. Chancery House Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
Application number, filing date88312450.530.12.1988
[1989/36]
Priority number, dateJP1988004996502.03.1988         Original published format: JP 4996588
[1989/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0330787
Date:06.09.1989
Language:EN
[1989/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0330787
Date:25.09.1991
Language:EN
[1991/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0330787
Date:13.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/50]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0330787
Date:18.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.1991
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/20, G01C21/22
[1991/43]
Former International [1989/36]G01C21/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1989/36]
TitleGerman:Navigationssystem[1989/36]
English:Navigation system[1989/36]
French:Système de navigation[1989/36]
Examination procedure11.03.1992Examination requested  [1992/19]
10.06.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.10.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.05.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.02.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.1994Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
05.06.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.06.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.1995Fee for grant paid
26.08.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.09.1996  14.10.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Mannesmann VDO AG
Rüsselsheimer Strasse 22
60326 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Klein, Thomas
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 [1998/02]
Former [1996/44]
Opponent(s)01  09.09.1996   
VDO Adolf Schindling AG
Rüsselsheimer Strasse 22
D-60326 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Klein, Thomas
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
18.10.1996Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.04.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.12.1997Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.12.1997Date of oral proceedings
02.01.1998Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.01.1998Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.03.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
17.06.1999Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition09.01.1995Appeal received No.  T0206/95
28.02.1995Statement of grounds filed
09.05.1995Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
31.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
29.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]JP62116210  ;
 [X]JP62293120  ;
 [X]JP62138719  ;
 [X]DE3323704  (BATTELLE INSTITUT E V [DE])
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 334 (P-631)[2781], 31st October 1987; & JP-A-62 116 210 (ADVANCED ELECTRON K.K.) 27-05-1987, & JP62116210 A 00000000
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 185 (P-710)[3032], 31st May 1988; & JP-A-62 293 120 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) 19-12-1987, & JP62293120 A 00000000
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 366 (P-641)[2813], 28th November 1987; & JP-A-62 138 719 (NISSAN MOTOR CO.) 22-06-1987, & JP62138719 A 00000000
by applicantJPS58115600
 JPS62142216
 JPH01149200
 JPS62116210
 JPS62293120
 JPS62138719
 DE3323704
OppositionJPS58115600
 JPS62142216
 JPH01149200
 JPS62116210
 JPS62293120
 JPS62138719
 DE3323704