blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0290296

EP0290296 - Liposomal formulations with a high antineoplastic agent/lipid ratio [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  06.08.2004
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE LIPOSOME COMPANY, INC.
One Research Way Princeton Forrestal Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
[N/P]
Former [1988/45]For all designated states
THE LIPOSOME COMPANY, INC.
One Research Way Princeton Forrestal Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bally, Marcel B.
5516 Corvette Crescent
Vancouver British Columbia V6T1M8 / CA
02 / Ginsberg, Richard S.
195 Monroe Avenue
Belle Mead, N.J. 08502 / US
03 / Mitilenes, George N.
9 Panewood Lane
Washington, N.Y. 07882 / US
04 / Culis, Pieter R.
1329 Walnut Street
Vancouver British Columbia V6J3Rs / CA
05 / Mayer, Lawrence D.
4084 West 35th Avenue
Vancouver British Columbia V6N2P3 / CA
[1988/45]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/49]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [1988/45]Warcoin, Jacques, et al
Cabinet Régimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber
F-75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date88400521.604.03.1988
[1988/45]
Priority number, dateUS1987002215405.03.1987         Original published format: US 22154
[1988/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0290296
Date:09.11.1988
Language:EN
[1988/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0290296
Date:28.06.1989
Language:EN
[1989/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0290296
Date:08.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.05.1989
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/50
[1988/45]
CPC:
A61K9/1278 (EP); A61K9/48 (KR); A61K9/127 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/45]
TitleGerman:Liposomen-Formulierungen mit hohem antineoplastischem Wirkstoff/Lipid-Verhältnis[1988/45]
English:Liposomal formulations with a high antineoplastic agent/lipid ratio[1988/45]
French:Formulations de liposomes avec un rapport élevé agent néoplastique/lipide[1988/45]
MiscellaneousEPB 1996/19: Teilanmeldung 95117084.4 eingereicht am 30/10/95
EPB 1996/19: Divisional application 95117084.4 filed on 30/10/95
EPB 1996/19: Demande divisionnaire 95117084.4 déposée le 30/10/95
Examination procedure18.12.1989Examination requested  [1990/08]
14.06.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.07.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
03.05.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.04.1994Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
13.06.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.04.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
26.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
08.11.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
13.11.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.1996Fee for grant paid
12.02.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP95117084.4  / EP0719546
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.02.1997  07.03.1997  ADMISSIBLE
ALZA Corporation
1010 Joaquin Road
Mountain View CA 94043 / US
Opponent's representative
Howard, Paul Nicholas
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 02  10.02.1997  15.04.1999  WITHDRAWN
NeXstar Pharmaceuticals Inc.
2860 Wilderness Place
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
Opponent's representative
Brown, David Leslie
Page Hargrave
Southgate
Whitefriars
Lewins Mead, Bristol
BS1 2NT / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2003/12]
Opponent(s)01  10.02.1997  07.03.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Alza Corporation
1900 Charleston Road
Mountain View, CA 94039-7210 / US
Opponent's representative
Howard, Paul Nicholas
Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
 02  10.02.1997  15.04.1999  WITHDRAWN
NeXstar Pharmaceuticals Inc.
2860 Wilderness Place
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
Opponent's representative
Brown, David Leslie
Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead
Bristol BS1 2NT / GB
Former [1997/14]
Opponent(s)01  10.02.1997   
SEQUUS Pharmaceuticals Inc.
960 Hamilton Court Menlo Park
CA94025 / US
Opponent's representative
Howard, Paul Nicholas
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
 02  10.02.1997    WITHDRAWN
NeXstar Pharmaceuticals Inc.
2860 Wilderness Place
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
Opponent's representative
Brown, David Leslie
Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol
BS1 2NT / GB
19.02.1997No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
04.03.1997No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
17.03.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.07.1998Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.06.1999Date of oral proceedings
07.07.1999Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.07.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.05.2004Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/39]
26.05.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition16.09.1999Appeal received No.  T0884/99
17.11.1999Statement of grounds filed
26.05.2004Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
26.05.2004Date of oral proceedings
02.06.2004Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:13.06.1994Request for further processing filed
13.06.1994Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.06.1994Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
09.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
09.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
09.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 08
08.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchEP0088046  [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]);
 WO8601102  [ ] (LIPOSOME CO INC [US])
    [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 101, No. 6, August 6, 1984, page 315, Ref. No. 43493j; Columbus, Ohio, US; R.L. MAGIN et al.: "Temperature-dependent drug release from large unilamellar liposomes", & Cancer Drug Delivery 1984, 1(2), 109-17, Abstract.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.