blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0300911

EP0300911 - Steering lock system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.09.1994
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.11.1994 [1994/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
No.2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama City / JP
For all designated states
ALPHA CORPORATION
2-8-2, Kamata Ota-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1993/38]For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
No.2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama City / JP
For all designated states
ALPHA CORPORATION
2-8-2, Kamata
Ota-ku Tokyo / JP
Former [1989/04]For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
No.2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama City / JP
For all designated states
KOKUSAN KINZOKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-8-2, Kamata
Ota-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takeda, Yoshimitsu
No. 637-7, Tatsunodai
Zama City / JP
02 / Mochida, Haruo
No. 1104-41, Susugadani Kiyokawa-mura Aiko-gun
Kanagawa Prefecture / JP
03 / Kanai, Toshio
No. 1425-49, Kosono
Ayase City / JP
04 / Masaki, Mikio c/o Kokusan Kinzoku
Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha No. 2-8-2, Kamata
Ota-ku Tokyo / JP
[1989/04]
Representative(s)Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al
CABINET WEINSTEIN 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1989/04]Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al
CABINET WEINSTEIN 20, Avenue de Friedland
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date88401894.621.07.1988
[1989/04]
Priority number, dateJP1987018202121.07.1987         Original published format: JP 18202187
[1989/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0300911
Date:25.01.1989
Language:EN
[1989/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0300911
Date:10.11.1993
Language:EN
[1993/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.1988
ClassificationIPC:B60R25/02
[1989/04]
CPC:
B60R25/02142 (EP,US); Y10T70/5938 (EP,US); Y10T70/5956 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5969 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1989/04]
TitleGerman:Lenkschlosssystem[1989/04]
English:Steering lock system[1989/04]
French:Dispositif de verrouillage de l'arbre de direction[1989/04]
Examination procedure01.08.1988Examination requested  [1989/04]
10.08.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.01.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.05.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.1993Fee for grant paid
13.08.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.08.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2176373  (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD [JP]);
 [Y]US3566632  (WALL THOMAS J, et al);
 [Y]FR2499005  (NEIMAN SA [FR]);
 [A]US3401544  (FRASER CYRIL C);
 [AP]DE3616122  (YMOS AG IND PRODUKTE [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.