Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0305252

EP0305252 - Multifunctional pneumatic or electro-pneumatic distributor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  22.03.1995
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JOUCOMATIC S.A.
32, Avenue Albert-1er
F-92506 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
[1989/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Boniface, Jean-Claude
26 résidence des taratres
F-92- Rueil-Malmaison / FR
02 / Valet, Thierry
38 rue Quetigny
F-93- Epinay sur Seine / FR
03 / Juhel, Bernard
128 rue Paul Vaillant Couturier
F-92- Nanterre / FR
[1989/09]
Representative(s)Armengaud Ainé, Alain
Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud
75116 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1989/09]Armengaud Ainé, Alain
Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud
F-75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date88402011.602.08.1988
[1989/09]
Priority number, dateFR1987001119206.08.1987         Original published format: FR 8711192
[1989/09]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0305252
Date:01.03.1989
Language:FR
[1989/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0305252
Date:05.06.1991
Language:FR
[1991/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.01.1989
ClassificationInternational:F16K27/00, F16K11/07
[1989/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/09]
TitleGerman:Pneumatischer oder elektro-pneumatischer Mehrzweckverteiler[1989/09]
English:Multifunctional pneumatic or electro-pneumatic distributor[1989/09]
French:Distributeur pneumatique ou électropneumatique multifonction[1989/09]
Examination procedure07.08.1989Request for accelerated examination filed
09.08.1989Examination requested  [1989/40]
16.11.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.1989Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
11.12.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.12.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.1991Fee for grant paid
07.02.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.02.1992  12.03.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Festo KG
Ruiter Strasse 82
73734 Esslingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Abel, Martin, et al
Patentanwälte
Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel
Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1992/17]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.1992  12.03.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Festo KG
Ruiter Strasse 82
D-73734 Esslingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Abel, Martin, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Magenbauer Dipl.-Phys. Dr. O. Reimold Dipl.-Phys. Dr. H. Vetter Dipl.-Ing. M. Abel Hölderlinweg 58
D-73728 Esslingen / DE
13.04.1992Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.08.1992Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.08.1992Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
28.11.1992Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
26.07.1993Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
14.02.1995Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1995/19]
Appeal following opposition21.09.1993Appeal received No.  T1007/93
20.11.1993Statement of grounds filed
14.02.1995Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
14.02.1995Date of oral proceedings
23.02.1995Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.199003   M06   Fee paid on   02.10.1990
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2474633  (HERION WERKE KG [DE]);
 [X]EP0103564  ;
 [A]EP0134185  (ABEX CORP [US]);
 [A]DE3114129  (PRAEDIFA JAEGER KG [DE]);
 [A]EP0108286  (PRAEDIFA JAEGER KG [DE])