blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0311509

EP0311509 - Safety belt holding mechanism with manually adjustable position [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.06.1993
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ECIA - EQUIPEMENTS ET COMPOSANTS POUR L'INDUSTRIE AUTOMOBILE
F-25400 Audincourt / FR
[N/P]
Former [1989/15]For all designated states
ECIA - EQUIPEMENTS ET COMPOSANTS POUR L'INDUSTRIE AUTOMOBILE
F-25400 Audincourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Escaravage, Gérard
5 Impasse des Graverots
F-25700 Valentigney / FR
02 / Henriot, Michel
F-25150 Ecurcey / FR
03 / Négri, Antoine
5 Rue des Courts Champs
F-25310 Hérimoncourt / FR
[1989/15]
Representative(s)Mestre, Jean, et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1989/15]Mestre, Jean, et al
c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date88402510.704.10.1988
[1989/15]
Priority number, dateFR1987001386607.10.1987         Original published format: FR 8713866
FR1988000159910.02.1988         Original published format: FR 8801599
[1989/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0311509
Date:12.04.1989
Language:FR
[1989/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0311509
Date:05.08.1992
Language:FR
[1992/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.1989
ClassificationIPC:B60R22/20
[1989/15]
CPC:
B60R22/201 (EP,US); B60R22/00 (KR)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   SE [1989/15]
TitleGerman:Sicherheitsgurthaltevorrichtung mit manueller Lageverstellung[1989/15]
English:Safety belt holding mechanism with manually adjustable position[1989/15]
French:Dispositif de maintien pour sangle de ceinture de sécurité à réglage manuel de la position[1989/15]
Examination procedure10.03.1989Examination requested  [1989/20]
07.06.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.08.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.02.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.05.1992Fee for grant paid
05.05.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT05.08.1992
SE05.08.1992
[2008/01]
Former [2002/23]IT05.08.1992
SE05.08.1992
Former [1999/42]IT05.08.1992
Documents cited:Search[A]LU59744  ;
 [A]EP0086633  (ASE UK LTD [GB]);
 [A]FR2299875  (CHRYSLER FRANCE [FR]);
 [A]FR2362641  (GUITARD LAURENT [FR]);
 [A]EP0180306  (ASE UK LTD [GB])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.