Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0309373

EP0309373 - Interactive animation of graphics objects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.1999
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1989/13]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Swix, Scott R.
3225 Post Woods Dr. Apt. D
Atlanta, GA 30339 / US
02 / Krueger, Leroy A.
5074 Ravenwood Drive
Marietta, GA 30066 / US
[1989/13]
Representative(s)de Pena, Alain , et al
Compagnie IBM France Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle
06610 La Gaude / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/04]de Pena, Alain , et al
Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle
06610 La Gaude / FR
Former [1989/13]Tubiana, Max
Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle
F-06610 La Gaude / FR
Application number, filing date88480023.630.08.1988
[1989/13]
Priority number, dateUS1987009865321.09.1987         Original published format: US 98653
[1989/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0309373
Date:29.03.1989
Language:EN
[1989/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0309373
Date:16.10.1991
Language:EN
[1991/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0309373
Date:03.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.08.1991
ClassificationInternational:G06T15/10, G06F3/033
[1998/23]
Former International [1991/42]G06F15/72, G06F3/033
Former International [1989/13]G06F15/72
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1989/13]
TitleGerman:Interaktives Inbewegungbringen von graphischen Objekten[1989/13]
English:Interactive animation of graphics objects[1989/13]
French:Animation interactive d'objets graphiques[1989/13]
Examination procedure20.07.1989Examination requested  [1989/38]
19.05.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.1994Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
01.09.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.12.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.1998Fee for grant paid
22.01.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination04.01.1995Appeal received No.  T0333/95
21.03.1995Statement of grounds filed
19.07.1996Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1996/29]
27.11.1996Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1996/48]
05.03.1997Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Opposition(s)04.03.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
17.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
19.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
19.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
10.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 08
27.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 09
18.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - PROCEEDINGS OF IFIP CONGRESS ON INFORMATION PROCESSING, Stockholm, 5th - 10th August 1974, pages 712-716, North-Holland Publishing Co., Amsterdam, NL; R.P. FUTRELLE: "Galatea: Interactive graphics for the analysis of moving images"
 [A]  - IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, vol. 7, no. 4, April 1987, pages 11-22, IEEE Society Press, New York, US; J. WILHELMS: "Toward automatic motion control"
 [Y]  - DATAMOTION, vol. 25, no. 5, May 1979, pages 150-156, Technical Publishing Co., Barrington, US; R.G. SHOUP: "Superpaint: the digital animator"
Examination   - Barrington, US; R.G. SHOUP: "Superpaint: the digital animator"