Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0309373 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0309373



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 212
08.04.1999 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
23.04.1998 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.01.1998 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.01.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
22.01.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
10.12.1997 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
09.12.1997 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.12.1997 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
01.09.1997 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
01.09.1997 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
18.08.1997 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
19.03.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.03.1997 Data sheet for the decision Search / examination 16
27.11.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
19.07.1996 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 3
19.07.1996 Communication regarding the examination of the appeal (ex parte) Appeal 1
20.06.1995 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
14.06.1995 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
21.03.1995 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
04.01.1995 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 6
04.01.1995 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 12
04.01.1995 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 6
04.01.1995 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
11.11.1994 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
11.11.1994 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 8
27.09.1994 Claims Search / examination 2
27.09.1994 Claims Search / examination 2
27.09.1994 Description Search / examination 3
27.09.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.09.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
19.05.1994 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
07.11.1991 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
27.08.1991 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.08.1991 European search report Search / examination 1
15.02.1989 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
30.08.1988 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.08.1988 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
30.08.1988 Claims Search / examination 2
30.08.1988 Description Search / examination 16
30.08.1988 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.08.1988 Drawings Search / examination 6
30.08.1988 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 34
30.08.1988 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.08.1988 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5