EP0290378 - Process for the preparation of 1-methyl-androsta-1,4-diene-3,17-dione, and intermediates for this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1992 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nickisch, Klaus, Dr. Alt-Lichtenrade 11 D-1000 Berlin 49 / DE | 02 /
Arnold, Hanfried, Dr. Von-Wettstein-Strasse 4 D-1000 Berlin 33 / DE | [1988/45] | Application number, filing date | 88730106.7 | 06.05.1988 | [1988/45] | Priority number, date | DE19873715869 | 07.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3715869 | [1988/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0290378 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0290378 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07J1/00 | [1988/45] | CPC: |
C07J1/0011 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1-Methyl-androsta-1,4-dien-3,17-dion und die neuen Zwischenprodukte für dieses Verfahren | [1988/45] | English: | Process for the preparation of 1-methyl-androsta-1,4-diene-3,17-dione, and intermediates for this process | [1988/45] | French: | Procédé de préparation de 1-méthyl-androsta-1,4-diène-3,17-dione et intermédiaires nécéssaires pour ce procédé | [1988/45] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/45] | 27.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 26.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/52] | Request for further processing for: | 26.09.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 26.09.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.10.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0129500 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [AD]DE3338212 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [AD]DE3539244 (SCHERING AG [DE]) |