blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0326783

EP0326783 - Motor-driven hand tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.06.1993
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.09.2009  [2009/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
9494 Schaan / LI
[N/P]
Former [1989/32]For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
FL-9494 Schaan / LI
Inventor(s)01 / Odoni, Walter, Dr.
Am Schrägen Weg 12
FL-9490 Vaduz / LI
02 / Boesch, Richard
Meienriet 309
CH-9406 Rüthi / CH
[1989/32]
Representative(s)Wildi, Roland
Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung
9494 Schaan / LI
[2009/38]
Former [1989/32]Wildi, Roland
Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung
FL-9490 Schaan / LI
Application number, filing date88810788.516.11.1988
[1989/32]
Priority number, dateDE1988380274030.01.1988         Original published format: DE 3802740
[1989/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0326783
Date:09.08.1989
Language:DE
[1989/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0326783
Date:10.10.1990
Language:DE
[1990/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0326783
Date:12.08.1992
Language:DE
[1992/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.08.1990
ClassificationIPC:B25F5/00
[1989/32]
CPC:
B25D16/003 (EP,US); B25F5/001 (EP,US); F16D67/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [1989/32]
TitleGerman:Motorisch betriebenes Handgerät[1989/32]
English:Motor-driven hand tool[1989/32]
French:Outil à main actionné par moteur[1989/32]
Examination procedure22.10.1990Examination requested  [1990/50]
23.01.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.02.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.1992Fee for grant paid
04.04.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.05.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL12.08.1992
GB16.11.1992
[1993/48]
Former [1993/15]NL12.08.1992
Documents cited:Search[A]US4287969  (MISUMI ATSUSHI, et al);
 [AD]GB2086277  (HILTI AG);
 [A]FR2526359  (MCCULLOCH CORP [US]);
 [A]EP0150669  (HILTI AG [LI]);
 [AD]DE2326087  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT);
 [A]DE3500324  (AMERICAN ASSEMBLY TOOLS INC [US]);
 [A]US4063600  (KRZES CASEY S);
 [A]EP0235670  (METABOWERKE KG);
 [A]EP0153724  (SACHS DOLMAR GMBH [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.