blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0325093

EP0325093 - Shock-wave ultrasonic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.04.1992
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.1992Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.06.1992 [1992/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CENTRO SVILUPPO MATERIALI S.p.A.
P.O. Box 10747 Via di Castel Romano 100-102
I-00129 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [1989/30]For all designated states
CENTRO SVILUPPO MATERIALI S.p.A.
P.O. Box 10747 Via di Castel Romano 100-102
I-00129 Roma / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Canella, Giuliano
Via dei Motoristi 87
I-00143 Roma / IT
02 / Monti, Federico
Via Umile 16
I-00144 Roma / IT
[1989/30]
Representative(s)Mariani, Giulio
c/o Centro Sviluppo Materiali SpA P.O. BOX 10747
I-00100 Roma Eur / IT
[N/P]
Former [1989/30]Mariani, Giulio
c/o Centro Sviluppo Materiali SpA P.O. BOX 10747
I-00100 Roma Eur / IT
Application number, filing date88830542.219.12.1988
[1989/30]
Priority number, dateIT1988004756422.01.1988         Original published format: IT 4756488
[1989/30]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0325093
Date:26.07.1989
Language:EN
[1989/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0325093
Date:21.03.1990
Language:EN
[1990/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.1990
ClassificationIPC:G01H1/00, G10K11/00
[1989/30]
CPC:
G01H1/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/30]
TitleGerman:Stosswellenultraschallgerät[1989/30]
English:Shock-wave ultrasonic device[1989/30]
French:Dispositif ultrasonique à ondes de chocs[1989/30]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure29.05.1990Examination requested  [1990/33]
05.08.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.1991Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1992/25]
21.01.1992Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1992/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.01.199103   M06   Fee paid on   05.03.1991
02.01.199204   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3919883  (NAKAMURA YOSIO, et al);
 [A]DE2946264  (AUDI AG [DE]);
 [A]AT379898B  (LIST HANS [AT])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.