Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0299989

EP0299989 - HIGH DENSITY CIRCUIT PANEL SOCKET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.1994
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.02.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.03.1994 [1994/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE WHITAKER CORPORATION
4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
[N/P]
Former [1993/04]For all designated states
THE WHITAKER CORPORATION
4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
Former [1989/51]For all designated states
AMP INCORPORATED
P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road
Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US
Former [1989/49]For all designated states
AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation)
P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road
Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US
Former [1989/04]For all designated states
AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation)
470 Friendship Road P.O. Box 3608
Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KUHN, Brent, Alan
4855-B Southern View Court
Winston-Salem, NC 27105 / US
02 / MARPOE, Gary, Ray, Jr.
5000 Split Rail Circle Apartment B-5
Winston-Salem, NC 27106 / US
03 / COLLER, James, Ray
405 Drayton Park
Kernersville, NC 27284 / US
[1989/04]
Representative(s)Warren, Keith Stanley , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
Cambridge House
100 Cambridge Grove
Hammersmith, London
W6 0LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/27]Warren, Keith Stanley , et al
BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Former [1989/04]Gray, Robin Oliver
BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date88900317.404.12.1987
[1989/04]
WO1987US03192
Priority number, dateUS1987000653823.01.1987         Original published format: US 6538
US1987000684827.01.1987         Original published format: US 6848
[1989/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO8805612
Date:28.07.1988
Language:EN
[1988/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0299989
Date:25.01.1989
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.1988
[1989/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0299989
Date:07.04.1993
Language:EN
[1993/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.07.1988
ClassificationInternational:H01R23/70
[1989/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1989/04]
TitleGerman:SCHALTUNGSPANEELBUCHSE HOHER DICHTE[1989/04]
English:HIGH DENSITY CIRCUIT PANEL SOCKET[1989/04]
French:PRISE POUR PLAQUETTE DE CIRCUIT A HAUTE DENSITE[1989/04]
Entry into regional phase12.09.1988National basic fee paid 
12.09.1988Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.1988Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.1988Examination requested  [1989/04]
11.09.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.06.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.1992Fee for grant paid
31.08.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.01.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational searchFR2142587  [ ];
 US3601775  [ ];
 US3474387  [ ];
 DE3011872  [ ]