Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0328675 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0328675



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 442
01.10.1998 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.10.1998 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.09.1998 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
07.07.1998 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
07.07.1998 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
06.07.1998 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
01.07.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.01.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
14.01.1998 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.01.1998 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
12.01.1998 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
08.01.1998 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
29.12.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.12.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
18.12.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
15.12.1997 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
02.05.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.04.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
08.01.1997 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.12.1996 Claims Appeal 1
30.12.1996 Claims Appeal 1
30.12.1996 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.12.1996 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
30.12.1996 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
14.11.1996 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.11.1996 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
05.11.1996 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.10.1996 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.09.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.09.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.09.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.09.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 8
20.09.1996 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
20.09.1996 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
20.09.1996 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 14
20.09.1996 Means of redress Opposition 1
20.09.1996 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
11.09.1996 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
22.07.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.07.1996 Claims Opposition 1
22.07.1996 Claims Opposition 1
22.07.1996 Claims Opposition 1
22.07.1996 Description Opposition 1
22.07.1996 Description Opposition 1
22.07.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.07.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.07.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
16.07.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 8
16.07.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 8
28.05.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.05.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
24.05.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.05.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.05.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.05.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
14.05.1996 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
14.05.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
14.05.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
03.05.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.05.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
30.04.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
19.04.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.04.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.04.1996 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.04.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.03.1996 Authorisation Opposition 1
28.03.1996 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
28.02.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.02.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
16.01.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.01.1996 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 13
07.09.1995 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 5
07.09.1995 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
22.03.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.03.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.02.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.02.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.02.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.01.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
27.01.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
27.01.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
16.01.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.01.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
11.01.1995 Authorisation Appeal 1
11.01.1995 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Appeal 1
25.11.1994 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 3
25.11.1994 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.11.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.11.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
15.09.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.09.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
29.04.1994 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
22.04.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.04.1994 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
22.04.1994 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
22.04.1994 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
29.03.1994 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.03.1994 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.03.1994 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
15.03.1994 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
04.03.1994 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
13.01.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.01.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.01.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.01.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 7
05.01.1994 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
05.01.1994 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.01.1994 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.01.1994 Means of redress Opposition 1
05.01.1994 Text intended for grant Opposition 9
23.12.1993 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
09.09.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.09.1993 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 4
25.05.1993 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
14.05.1993 Claims Opposition 2
14.05.1993 Description Opposition 1
14.05.1993 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
20.01.1993 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
20.01.1993 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.12.1992 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.11.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.11.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
27.11.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.11.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.11.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
27.11.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
27.11.1992 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
12.02.1992 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.01.1992 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 1
20.12.1991 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.12.1991 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
20.12.1991 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.09.1991 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
12.09.1991 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
26.07.1991 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.07.1991 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
17.07.1991 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
05.01.1990 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 2
22.12.1989 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
12.12.1989 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.12.1989 European search report Search / examination 4
13.04.1989 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.04.1989 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.03.1989 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.03.1989 Authorisation Search / examination 1
14.03.1989 Claims Search / examination 2
14.03.1989 Description Search / examination 13
14.03.1989 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
14.03.1989 Translation of priority document Search / examination 19
03.03.1989 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
09.02.1989 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
09.02.1989 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 14
09.02.1989 Priority document Search / examination 18
18.08.1988 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1