Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0329738

EP0329738 - TENSIONING DEVICE FOR V-BELTS, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.1993
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.04.1993 [1993/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INA Wälzlager Schaeffler KG
Postfach 1220
91063 Herzogenaurach / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/45]For all designated states
INA Wälzlager Schaeffler KG
Industriestrasse 1-3 Postfach 1220
D-91063 Herzogenaurach / DE
Former [1990/06]For all designated states
INA Wälzlager Schaeffler KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
D-8522 Herzogenaurach / DE
Former [1989/35]For all designated states
SCHRÖDER, Werner
Post Dietramszell 1
D-8157 Lochen 37 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BREINDL, Werner
Siriusstrasse 2
D-8044 Unterschleissheim / DE
02 / SCHRÖDER Werner
Lochen 37
D-8157 Dietramszell 1 / DE
[1990/06]
Former [1989/35]01 / BREINDL, Werner
Siriusstrasse 2
D-8044 Unterschleissheim / DE
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[1991/37]
Former [1989/35]Baumann, Eduard, Dipl.-Phys.
Postfach 12 01
D-85632 Höhenkirchen bei München / DE
Application number, filing date88907061.101.08.1988
[1989/35]
WO1988EP00696
Priority number, dateDE19870010548U31.07.1987         Original published format: DE 8710548 U
[1989/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO8901098
Date:09.02.1989
Language:DE
[1989/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0329738
Date:30.08.1989
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.1989
[1989/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0329738
Date:22.04.1992
Language:DE
[1992/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.02.1989
ClassificationInternational:F16H7/12
[1989/35]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1990/06]
Former [1989/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPANNEN VON KEILRIEMEN, INSBESONDERE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE[1989/35]
English:TENSIONING DEVICE FOR V-BELTS, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLES[1989/35]
French:DISPOSITIF TENDEUR DE COURROIES TRAPEZOIDALES, NOTAMMENT POUR VEHICULES A MOTEUR[1989/35]
Entry into regional phase29.03.1989National basic fee paid 
29.03.1989Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.1989Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.1989Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.07.1989Examination requested  [1989/39]
14.08.1989Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, LU, NL, SE
24.05.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.10.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.1991Fee for grant paid
18.12.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.01.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.07.1989AT   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.1989BE   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.1989CH   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.1989LU   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.1989NL   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.1989SE   M01   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational searchFR2350518  [ ];
 GB1304368  [ ];
 US4657524  [ ];
 EP0243237  [ ]
ExaminationDE3211095