Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0329770

EP0329770 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING NOVEL POLYESTER BIOPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  06.03.1998
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[1989/35]
Inventor(s)01 / PEOPLES, Oliver, P.
104 Fairmont Street
Arlington, MA 02174 / US
02 / SINSKEY, Anthony, J.
285 Commonwealth Avenue
Boston, MA 02115 / US
[1989/35]
Representative(s)Bassett, Richard Simon , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/35]Bassett, Richard Simon , et al
ERIC POTTER & CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate
Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB
Application number, filing date88908449.727.06.1988
[1989/35]
WO1988US02227
Priority number, dateUS1987006769529.06.1987         Original published format: US 67695
[1989/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO8900202
Date:12.01.1989
[1989/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0329770
Date:30.08.1989
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.1989
[1989/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.02.1989
ClassificationInternational:C12P7/62, C12N15/00, C08G63/06
[1989/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/35]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR PRODUKTION VON POLYESTERBIOPOLYMEREN[1989/35]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING NOVEL POLYESTER BIOPOLYMERS[1989/35]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE NOUVEAUX BIOPOLYMERES DE POLYESTER[1989/35]
MiscellaneousEPB 1995/33: Teilanmeldung 95201427.2 eingereicht am 27/06/88
EPB 1995/33: Divisional application 95201427.2 filed on 27/06/88
EPB 1995/33: Demande divisionnaire 95201427.2 déposée le 27/06/88
Entry into regional phase23.03.1989National basic fee paid 
23.03.1989Designation fee(s) paid 
23.03.1989Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.03.1989Examination requested  [1989/35]
13.03.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.1994Date of oral proceedings
23.02.1995Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/17]
23.02.1995Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.09.1997Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/17]
Appeal following examination28.03.1995Appeal received No.  T0639/95
03.07.1995Statement of grounds filed
21.01.1998Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
26.09.1997Date of oral proceedings
10.10.1997Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP01202302.4  / EP1229123
EP95201427.2  / EP0688865
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
18.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
12.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 08
10.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 09
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0202442  (SWEDEX VERTRIEB [DE]);
 [A]EP0069497  (ICI PLC [GB])
 [X]  - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 106, no. 5, 02 February 1987, Columbus, OHIO, US, Peoples, Oliver P et al.: "Biosynthetic thiolase from Zooloea ramigera.III. Isolation and characterization of the structural gene", Page 118, Abstract 28324q, & J. Biol. Chem., 1987, 262(1), 97-102 (ENG.)
 [P]  - European Journal Biochemistry, Vol. 174, 1988, Olivier Ploux et al., "The NADPH-linked acetoacetyl-CoA reductase from Zooloea ramigera", pp 177-182.
    [ ] - Protein Engineering, 1987, William J. Rutter et al., "Redesigning Proteins via Genetic Engineering", Dale L. Oxender and C. Fred Fox, Alan R. Liss, Inc., New York, pp 257-267.