Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0329770 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0329770



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 422
13.06.2003 Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore Search / examination 1
02.03.1998 Closing of application Search / examination 2
28.02.1998 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
23.02.1998 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.02.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.01.1998 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 20
12.11.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
28.10.1997 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
21.10.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
10.10.1997 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.09.1997 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
16.09.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
26.06.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
23.06.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
19.06.1997 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
16.06.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 1
24.04.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.10.1996 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
23.07.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.08.1995 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
04.08.1995 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
03.07.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.07.1995 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
28.03.1995 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
01.03.1995 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.02.1995 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
23.02.1995 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 30
19.10.1994 Claims Search / examination 1
19.10.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
19.10.1994 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 8
28.06.1994 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
24.06.1994 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.06.1994 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 8
14.06.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
13.06.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
10.06.1994 Preparation of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
06.06.1994 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.11.1993 Claims Search / examination 1
03.11.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
30.07.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
20.01.1993 Claims Search / examination 1
20.01.1993 Description Search / examination 1
20.01.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
09.12.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
02.12.1992 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.10.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.07.1992 Annex Search / examination 52
21.07.1992 Claims Search / examination 2
21.07.1992 Description Search / examination 10
21.07.1992 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
13.03.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
27.03.1990 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.09.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
07.08.1989 Claims Search / examination 3
07.08.1989 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.07.1989 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.07.1989 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.1989 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.1989 Invitation to pay claims fees Search / examination 1
30.05.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
08.05.1989 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 1
24.03.1989 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
09.02.1989 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
09.02.1989 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
06.02.1989 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
12.01.1989 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 82
12.01.1989 Priority document Search / examination 67
13.10.1988 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
27.06.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
27.06.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
27.06.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6