blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0348448

EP0348448 - APPARATUS FOR CONNECTING ELECTRICAL CONNECTORS TO CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.04.1994
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.05.1994 [1994/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE WHITAKER CORPORATION
4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
[N/P]
Former [1993/04]For all designated states
THE WHITAKER CORPORATION
4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
Former [1990/01]For all designated states
AMP INCORPORATED (a Pennsylvania corporation)
P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road
Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DEN OTTER, Johannes, Marinus, Jacobus
Heihoven 54
NL-5244 GK Rosmalen / NL
[1990/01]
Representative(s)Warren, Keith Stanley, et al
Baron Warren Redfern
Cambridge House
100 Cambridge Grove
Hammersmith, London
W6 0LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/01]Warren, Keith Stanley, et al
BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date88908871.219.09.1988
[1990/01]
WO1988US03202
Priority number, dateGB1987002568203.11.1987         Original published format: GB 8725682
[1990/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO8904557
Date:18.05.1989
Language:EN
[1989/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0348448
Date:03.01.1990
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1990/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0348448
Date:02.06.1993
Language:EN
[1993/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.05.1989
ClassificationIPC:H01R43/01
[1990/01]
CPC:
H01R43/01 (EP,KR)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1993/14]
Former [1990/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANSCHLIESSEN ELEKTRISCHER VERBINDER MIT KABELN[1990/01]
English:APPARATUS FOR CONNECTING ELECTRICAL CONNECTORS TO CABLE[1990/01]
French:APPAREIL DE CONNEXION DE CONNECTEURS ELECTRIQUES A UN CABLE[1990/01]
Entry into regional phase28.07.1989National basic fee paid 
28.07.1989Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.1989Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.1989Examination requested  [1990/04]
16.06.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
20.10.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
17.11.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.1993Fee for grant paid
11.02.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
17.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational searchUS4584757  [ ] (ADLON DANIEL T [US], et al);
 US4561178  [ ] (VAN DE KERKHOF LODEVICUS L J [DE]);
 US4675995  [ ] (ANDERSON JAMES D [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.