blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0324493

EP0324493 - Optical waveguide devices, elements for making the devices and methods of making the devices and elements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.1997
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 12.02.2003  [2003/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [1989/29]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Booth, Bruce Lee
Warpath Road R. D. 4
West Chester Pennsylvania 19382 / US
02 / Marchegiano, Joseph Emidio
12 Woodcrest Way Fox Chase
Landenberg Pennsylvania 19350 / US
[1996/46]
Former [1989/29]01 / Booth, Bruce Lee
Warpath Road R. D. 4
Whest Chester Pennsylvania 19382 / US
02 / Marchegiano, Joseph Emidio
12 Woodcrest Way Fox Chase
Landenberg Pennsylvania 19350 / US
Representative(s)Abitz, Walter, et al
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/08]Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
D-81628 München / DE
Former [1989/29]Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
D-81628 München / DE
Application number, filing date89100520.913.01.1989
[1989/29]
Priority number, dateUS1988014400315.01.1988         Original published format: US 144003
[1989/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0324493
Date:19.07.1989
Language:EN
[1989/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0324493
Date:27.11.1991
Language:EN
[1991/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0324493
Date:13.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.1991
ClassificationIPC:G03F7/00, G02B6/00
[1989/29]
CPC:
G02B6/34 (EP); G02B6/00 (KR); G02B6/124 (EP);
G02B6/138 (EP); G02B6/2804 (EP); G02B6/2821 (EP);
G02B6/30 (EP); G03F7/001 (EP); G02B2006/12107 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1989/29]
TitleGerman:Optische Wellenleiter, Elemente für die Herstellung dieser Vorrichtungen und Herstellungsverfahren für diese Elemente und Vorrichtungen[1989/29]
English:Optical waveguide devices, elements for making the devices and methods of making the devices and elements[1989/29]
French:Guide pour ondes optiques, éléments pour la fabrication de ces dispositifs et méthode pour la fabrication de ces dispositifs et éléments[1989/29]
Examination procedure27.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/09]
05.01.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.07.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.05.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.1996Fee for grant paid
24.07.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.08.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
26.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.11.1996
BE13.11.1996
CH13.11.1996
LI13.11.1996
NL13.11.1996
[2003/07]
Former [2000/52]AT13.11.1996
BE13.11.1996
CH13.11.1996
LI13.11.1996
Former [2000/50]AT13.11.1996
BE13.11.1996
CH18.02.1997
LI18.02.1997
Former [1997/39]AT13.11.1996
BE13.11.1996
Former [1997/28]AT13.11.1996
Documents cited:Search[A]LU65581  ;
 [AD]US3809732  (CHANDROSS E, et al);
 [A]DE2553924  (YEDA RES & DEV);
 [X]GB2191603  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.