blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0328086

EP0328086 - Articles incorporating non-continuous holographs and methods of making them [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1989/33]Non-continuous holographs, methods of making them and articles incorporating them
[1996/05]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  16.11.2001
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
American Bank Note Holographics, Inc.
500 Executive Boulevard Elmsford
New York 10523 / US
[N/P]
Former [1989/33]For all designated states
AMERICAN BANK NOTE HOLOGRAPHICS, INC.
500 Executive Boulevard
Elmsford New York 10523 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mallik, Donald W.
138 Harwood Avenue
North Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
[1989/33]
Representative(s)Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Alexandrastraße 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/16]Blumbach, Kramer & Partner
Patentanwälte, Sonnenberger Strasse 100
D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [1994/35]Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte
Sonnenberger Strasse 100
D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [1990/08]Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte
Sonnenberger Strasse 100
D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [1989/33]Bernhardt, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing.
Reinländer & Bernhardt Patentanwälte Orthstrasse 12
D-81245 München / DE
Application number, filing date89102182.609.02.1989
[1989/33]
Priority number, dateUS1988015630512.02.1988         Original published format: US 156305
US1988016064126.02.1988         Original published format: US 160641
US1988029124723.12.1988         Original published format: US 291247
[1989/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0328086
Date:16.08.1989
Language:EN
[1989/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0328086
Date:30.05.1990
Language:EN
[1990/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0328086
Date:31.01.1996
[1996/05]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0328086
Date:02.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.1990
ClassificationIPC:G06K19/06, G06K19/08, B42D15/02
[1990/21]
CPC:
G03H1/0256 (EP,US); G03H1/0236 (EP,US); G06K19/16 (EP,US);
G03H1/0011 (EP,US); G03H1/0244 (EP,US); G03H1/265 (EP,US);
G03H2001/187 (EP,US); G03H2001/2223 (EP,US); G03H2001/2228 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2615 (EP,US); G03H2223/25 (EP,US); G03H2250/10 (EP,US);
G03H2250/12 (EP,US); G03H2250/36 (EP,US); Y10S283/904 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1989/33]G06K19/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/33]
TitleGerman:Gegenstände mit nicht kontinuierlichen Hologrammen, und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung[1996/05]
English:Articles incorporating non-continuous holographs and methods of making them[1996/05]
French:Objets avec des hologrammes non continus intégrés et procédé de leur fabrication[1996/05]
Former [1989/33]Nicht kontinuierliche Hologramme, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und damit ausgestatteter Gegenstand
Former [1989/33]Non-continuous holographs, methods of making them and articles incorporating them
Former [1989/33]Hologrammes non continus, procédé de leur fabrication et des objets des intégrant
Examination procedure09.02.1989Examination requested  [1989/33]
10.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.03.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.12.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.08.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.1995Fee for grant paid
12.10.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.10.1996  10.12.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Leonhard Kurz GmbH & Co.
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
 02  31.10.1996  10.12.1996  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
 03  31.10.1996  10.12.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Landis & Gyr Technology Innovation AG
CH-6301 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Müller, Hans-Jürgen
Müller Schupfner & Partner
Patentanwälte
Bavariaring 11
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1998/09]
Opponent(s)01  24.10.1996  10.12.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Leonhard Kurz GmbH & Co.
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ
Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
 02  31.10.1996  10.12.1996  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
D-81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
 03  31.10.1996  10.12.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Landis & Gyr Technology Innovation AG
CH-6301 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Müller, Hans-Jürgen
Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11
80336 München / DE
Former [1997/03]
Opponent(s)01  24.10.1996  10.12.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Leonhard Kurz GmbH & Co.
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ
Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
 02  31.10.1996  10.12.1996  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
D-81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
 03  31.10.1996  10.12.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Landis & Gyr Technology Innovation AG
CH-6301 Zug / CH
Former [1996/52]
Opponent(s)01  24.10.1996  10.12.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Leonhard Kurz GmbH & Co.
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ
Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
 02  31.10.1996   
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
D-81677 München / DE
 03  31.10.1996  10.12.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Landis & Gyr Technology Innovation AG
CH-6301 Zug / CH
Former [1996/51]
Opponent(s)01  24.10.1996   
Leonhard Kurz GmbH & Co.
Schwabacher Strasse 482
D-90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
Pöhlau, Claus (DE)
Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz Patentanwälte Merianstrasse 26
D-90409 Nürnberg / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
12.12.1996Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.06.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.03.1998Date of oral proceedings
30.03.1998Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.03.1998Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
31.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2000Reply to a communication from the opposition division
06.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
07.11.2000Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
26.01.2001Reply to a communication from the opposition division
27.04.2001Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.05.2001Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.08.2001Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
30.10.2001Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition17.04.1998Appeal received No.  T0387/98
25.07.1998Statement of grounds filed
27.01.1999Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M06) [1999/05]
26.11.1999Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
26.11.1999Date of oral proceedings
01.12.1999Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
13.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
13.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
23.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.01.1996
BE31.01.1996
CH31.01.1996
ES31.01.1996
FR31.01.1996
GR31.01.1996
IT31.01.1996
LI31.01.1996
NL31.01.1996
LU29.02.1996
SE30.04.1996
DE01.05.1996
[2006/14]
Former [2003/07]AT31.01.1996
BE31.01.1996
CH31.01.1996
ES31.01.1996
GR31.01.1996
IT31.01.1996
LI31.01.1996
NL31.01.1996
LU29.02.1996
SE30.04.1996
DE01.05.1996
FR28.06.1996
Former [2002/24]AT31.01.1996
BE31.01.1996
CH31.01.1996
ES31.01.1996
GR31.01.1996
IT31.01.1996
LI31.01.1996
LU29.02.1996
SE30.04.1996
DE01.05.1996
FR28.06.1996
Former [2000/52]AT31.01.1996
BE31.01.1996
CH31.01.1996
GR31.01.1996
IT31.01.1996
LI31.01.1996
LU29.02.1996
SE30.04.1996
DE01.05.1996
FR28.06.1996
Former [2000/50]AT31.01.1996
BE31.01.1996
GR31.01.1996
IT31.01.1996
LU29.02.1996
SE30.04.1996
DE01.05.1996
CH06.05.1996
LI06.05.1996
FR28.06.1996
Former [2000/04]AT31.01.1996
BE31.01.1996
GR31.01.1996
IT31.01.1996
LU29.02.1996
SE30.04.1996
DE01.05.1996
FR28.06.1996
Former [1999/42]AT31.01.1996
BE31.01.1996
IT31.01.1996
SE30.04.1996
DE01.05.1996
FR28.06.1996
Former [1997/04]AT31.01.1996
BE31.01.1996
SE30.04.1996
DE01.05.1996
FR28.06.1996
Former [1996/51]AT31.01.1996
BE31.01.1996
SE30.04.1996
DE01.05.1996
Former [1996/44]AT31.01.1996
SE30.04.1996
DE01.05.1996
Former [1996/42]AT31.01.1996
SE30.04.1996
Former [1996/38]SE30.04.1996
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0075674  (LANDIS & GYR AG [CH]);
 [X]GB2136352  (HOLLUSIONS LIMITED);
 [X]EP0253089  (LANDIS & GYR AG [CH]);
 [A]EP0201323  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP])
OppositionDE3206062
 DE3422908
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.