EP0330050 - Special chemiluminescent acridine derivatives and their use in luminescence immunoassays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dade Behring Marburg GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states Dade Behring Marburg GmbH Postfach 11 49 35001 Marburg / DE | ||
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kinkel, Tonio, Dr. Hörselbergstrasse 1 D-6230 Frankfurt am Main 80 / DE | 02 /
Molz, Peter, Dr. Kaiser-Wilhelm-Ring 44 D-6500 Mainz / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Erwin, Dr. Am Flachsland 26 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | 04 /
Schnorr, Gerd, Dr. Auf dem Lattigkopf 23 D-6368 Bad Vilbel / DE | 05 /
Skrzipczyk, Heinz Jürgen, Dr. Am Schellberg 16 D-6232 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | [1989/35] | Application number, filing date | 89102487.9 | 14.02.1989 | [1989/35] | Priority number, date | DE19883805318 | 20.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3805318 | [1989/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0330050 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0330050 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0330050 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09B15/00, C07D219/00, G01N33/58, G01N33/543 | [1989/35] | CPC: |
C09B15/00 (EP);
G01N33/533 (EP);
G01N33/582 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/35] | Title | German: | Spezielle chemilumineszierende Acridinderivate und ihre Verwendung in Lumineszenzimmunoassays | [1989/35] | English: | Special chemiluminescent acridine derivatives and their use in luminescence immunoassays | [1989/35] | French: | Dérivés spéciaux d'acridine chimiluminescents et leur utilisation dans des tests d'immunoluminescence | [1989/35] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 13.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/32] | Request for further processing for: | 29.07.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.10.1998 | Decision despatched | 18.07.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 18.07.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 01.08.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0082636 (WELSH NAT SCHOOL MED [GB]); | [A]EP0216553 (INTEGRATED GENETICS INC [US]); | [XP]EP0257541 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [AP]EP0273115 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) | [AD] - CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, Band 29, Nr. 8, August 1983, Seiten 1474-1479, Winston, US; I. WEEKS et al.: "Acridinium esters as high-specific-activity labels in immunoassay" |