Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0346564

EP0346564 - Compressive stent and delivery system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.10.1992
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.12.1992 [1992/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
7000 Central Avenue N.E. Minneapolis
Minnesota 55432-3576 / US
[N/P]
Former [1989/51]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
7000 Central Avenue N.E.
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-3576 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dance, Creg W.
19276 Twin Lakes Road
Elk River Minn. 55330 / US
02 / Letac, Brice
134 Rue Du Renard
F-76000 Rouen / FR
03 / Wolff, Rodney G.
468 W. Eagle Lake Drive
Maple Grove Minn. 55369 / US
04 / Cribier, Alain
2 Rue Alain
F-76150 Maromme / FR
[1989/51]
Representative(s)Kopacz, William James
Law Offices Kopacz
129 Boulevard Saint-Germain
75006 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1990/10]Kopacz, William James
83, Avenue Foch
F-75116 Paris / FR
Former [1989/51]Kopacz, William James
83 avenue Foch (3 étage)
F-75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date89102879.720.02.1989
[1989/51]
Priority number, dateUS1988020825217.06.1988         Original published format: US 208252
[1989/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0346564
Date:20.12.1989
Language:EN
[1989/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0346564
Date:27.12.1991
Language:EN
[1991/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.1989
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/66, A61F2/06
[1991/52]
Former International [1989/51]A61F2/66
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [1989/51]
TitleGerman:Gerät zur Erweiterung von Gefässen und System zum Einbringen desselben[1989/51]
English:Compressive stent and delivery system[1989/51]
French:Support tubulaire compressible et système de mise en place[1989/51]
Examination procedure15.12.1989Examination requested  [1990/06]
26.04.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.06.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.1991Fee for grant paid
20.07.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.09.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.01.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0221570  ;
 [AD]EP0177330  ;
 [A]US4665918  (GARZA GILBERT A [US], et al);
 [A]DE3706077  (MO MED INST PIROGOVA)