blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0331961

EP0331961 - Method for protein synthesis using CKS fusion proteins [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.1996
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.12.1996 [1996/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
One Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US
[N/P]
Former [1989/37]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
One Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bolling, Timothy Jon
36177 Douglas Terrace
Gurnee, Illinois 60031 / US
02 / Mandecki, Wlodzimierz
516 Hemlock Lane
Libertyville, Illinois 60048 / US
[1989/37]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido, et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1989/37]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al
Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16
I-20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date89102928.220.02.1989
[1989/37]
Priority number, dateUS1988016706711.03.1988         Original published format: US 167067
US1988027626323.11.1988         Original published format: US 276263
[1989/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0331961
Date:13.09.1989
Language:EN
[1989/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0331961
Date:04.07.1990
Language:EN
[1990/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0331961
Date:20.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.1990
ClassificationIPC:C12P21/00, C12N15/54, C12N15/67, C07K2/00
[1995/51]
CPC:
C12N15/70 (EP,US); C12N15/00 (KR); C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP,US); C12N9/1241 (EP,US); C12N9/6459 (EP,US);
C12Y304/21069 (EP,US); G01N33/531 (EP,US); G01N33/535 (EP,US);
G01N33/56988 (EP,US); G01N33/5767 (EP,US); C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/033 (EP,US); C07K2319/33 (EP,US); C07K2319/40 (EP,US);
C12N2710/16622 (EP,US); C12N2740/16122 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1989/37]C12P21/00, C12N15/00, C07K15/04, C07K15/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/37]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Proteinen durch Verwendung von CKS-Fusionsproteinen[1989/37]
English:Method for protein synthesis using CKS fusion proteins[1989/37]
French:Procédé pour la production de protéines en utilisant de protéines fusionnées du type CKS[1989/37]
Examination procedure28.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/10]
22.06.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.02.1994Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
13.04.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.06.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.1995Fee for grant paid
25.07.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.09.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50]
Request for further processing for:13.04.1994Request for further processing filed
13.04.1994Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.04.1994Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
15.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XP]WO8803170  (WHITSETT JEFFREY A [US], et al)
 [AD]  - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 261, no. 34, 5th December 1986, pages 15831-15835, The American of Biological Chemists, Inc., US; R.C. GOLDMAN et al.: "Primary structure of CTP:CMP-3-deoxy-D-manno-octulosonate cytidylytransferase (CMP-KDO synthetase) from Escherichia coli"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.