blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0337185

EP0337185 - Portable data carrier assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  07.05.2004
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SPA Syspatronic AG
Lauriedstrasse 7
6300 Zug / CH
[2001/33]
Former [1989/42]For all designated states
SPA Syspatronic AG
Industriestrasse 31 Postfach 2066
CH-6302 Zug / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Schwartz, Hermann
Schützenstrasse 18
CH-8808 Pfäffikon / CH
[1989/42]
Representative(s)OK pat AG
Industriestrasse 47
6300 Zug / CH
[N/P]
Former [1995/22]OK pat AG
Hinterbergstrasse 36, Postfach 5254
CH-6330 Cham / CH
Former [1989/42]Kägi, Otto Patentanwalt
St. Jakobstrasse 48 Postfach 201
CH-6330 Cham / CH
Application number, filing date89105509.729.03.1989
[1989/42]
Priority number, dateCH1988000132311.04.1988         Original published format: CH 132388
[1989/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0337185
Date:18.10.1989
Language:DE
[1989/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0337185
Date:27.03.1991
Language:DE
[1991/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0337185
Date:31.05.1995
Language:DE
[1995/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.1991
ClassificationIPC:G07F7/10
[1989/42]
CPC:
G07F7/1008 (EP,US); G06Q20/341 (EP,US); G06Q20/357 (EP,US);
G06Q20/367 (EP,US); G06Q20/40975 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1989/42]
TitleGerman:Tragbare Datenträgeranordnung[1989/42]
English:Portable data carrier assembly[1989/42]
French:Support de données portatif[1989/42]
Examination procedure04.05.1991Examination requested  [1991/27]
01.04.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.10.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.1994Fee for grant paid
08.12.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.02.1996  16.04.1996  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
 02  29.02.1996  16.04.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hermann, Uwe
Epping Hermann Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/01]
Opponent(s)01  23.02.1996  16.04.1996  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
D-81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
 02  29.02.1996  16.04.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Str. 53
81541 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hermann, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing.
Epping, Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2001/06]
Opponent(s)01  23.02.1996  16.04.1996  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
D-81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
 02  29.02.1996  16.04.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hermann, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing.
Epping, Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [1996/17]
Opponent(s)01  23.02.1996  16.04.1996  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
D-81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
 02  29.02.1996  16.04.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
Former [1996/16]
Opponent(s)01  23.02.1996  16.04.1996  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
D-81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
19.04.1996Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.08.1996Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
30.09.1997Reply to a communication from the opposition division
23.09.1998Date of oral proceedings
26.10.1998Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.10.1998Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.01.2004Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/26]
21.01.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition15.12.1998Appeal received No.  T0042/99
03.03.1999Statement of grounds filed
21.01.2004Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
21.01.2004Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
05.05.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.199305   M06   Fee paid on   05.05.1993
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0152024  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]);
 [A]FR2592502  (LEFEVRE JEAN PIERRE [FR]);
 [A]WO8705420  (DATA CARD CORP [US]);
 [A]EP0250309  (BULL CP8 [FR]);
 [A]US4734568  (WATANABE HIROSHI [JP]);
 [AP]DE3736190  (HITACHI LTD [JP])
ExaminationEP0218176
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.