blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0344600

EP0344600 - Process for increasing scrap addition by preparing the scrap in the converter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.02.1994
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.1997Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 16.04.1997 [1997/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KLÖCKNER STAHL GMBH
Klöcknerstrasse 29
47057 Duisburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/49]For all designated states
KLÖCKNER STAHL GMBH
Klöcknerstrasse 29
D-47057 Duisburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Langhammer, Hans Jürgen, Dr.-Ing.
Wollaher Strasse 42
D-2863 Ritterhude / DE
[1989/49]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[1993/47]
Former [1993/13]Röther, Peter, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Patentabteilung Klöckner-Werke AG Klöcknerstrasse 29
D-47057 Duisburg / DE
Former [1989/49]Vomberg, Friedhelm, Dipl.-Phys.
KLÖCKNER-WERKE AG Patentabteilung Klöcknerstrasse 29
D-47057 Duisburg / DE
Application number, filing date89109348.624.05.1989
[1989/49]
Priority number, dateDE1988381903103.06.1988         Original published format: DE 3819031
[1989/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0344600
Date:06.12.1989
Language:DE
[1989/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0344600
Date:21.03.1990
Language:DE
[1990/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0344600
Date:31.03.1993
Language:DE
[1993/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.1990
ClassificationIPC:C21C5/28, C21C5/46
[1989/49]
CPC:
C21C5/562 (EP); C21C5/28 (EP); C21C5/35 (EP);
Y02P10/143 (EP); Y02P10/20 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/49]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Schrottzusatzerhöhung durch Vorwärmen von Schrott im Konverter[1989/49]
English:Process for increasing scrap addition by preparing the scrap in the converter[1989/49]
French:Procédé pour augmenter l'addition de ferraille par un préchauffage de cette ferraille dans le convertisseur[1989/49]
Examination procedure24.05.1989Examination requested  [1989/49]
28.10.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.09.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.1992Fee for grant paid
15.09.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP61096020  ;
 [A]US3839017  (SCHEMPP E);
 [Y]FR2272179  (USS ENG & CONSULT [US]);
 [A]GB2011477  (MAXIMILIANSHUETTE EISENWERK);
 [A]EP0059289  (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]);
 [A]GB2142655  (N PROIZV OB TULATSCHERMET)
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 10, Nr. 276 (C-373)[2832], 19. September 1986; & JP-A-61 096 020 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP.) 14-05-1986, & JP61096020 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.