blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0349940

EP0349940 - Phthalimidohexanperacid, process for preparing the same and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1990/02]Imidoperacids, process for their preparation and their application
[1998/20]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  15.04.2003
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Clariant GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[1997/50]
Former [1990/02]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gethöffer, Hanspeter, Dr.
Geisenheimer Strasse 97
D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 71 / DE
02 / Reinhardt, Gerd, Dr.
Frieiherr-vom-Stein-Strasse 37
D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE
[1990/02]
Application number, filing date89112062.801.07.1989
[1990/02]
Priority number, dateDE1988382317208.07.1988         Original published format: DE 3823172
[1990/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0349940
Date:10.01.1990
Language:DE
[1990/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0349940
Date:13.05.1998
Language:DE
[1998/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.1989
ClassificationIPC:C07D207/40, C07D211/88, C07D207/44, C07D209/48, C07D223/10, C11D3/395
[1990/02]
CPC:
C07D207/412 (EP,US); C07D209/48 (EP,KR,US); C07D207/448 (EP,US);
C07D209/58 (KR); C07D211/88 (EP,US); C07D223/10 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US); C11D3/3945 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1990/02]
TitleGerman:Phthalimidoperoxihexansäure, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung[1998/20]
English:Phthalimidohexanperacid, process for preparing the same and use thereof[1998/20]
French:Phthalimidohexanpéracide, procédé pour sa préparation et son application[1998/20]
Former [1990/02]Imidoperoxicarbonsäuren, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung
Former [1990/02]Imidoperacids, process for their preparation and their application
Former [1990/02]Imidopéracides, procédé pour leur préparation et leur application
Examination procedure14.03.1990Examination requested  [1990/19]
08.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.03.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.11.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
05.11.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
17.11.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.1998Fee for grant paid
27.02.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.02.1999  12.11.1999  WITHDRAWN
AUSIMONT S.p.A.
Piazetta Maurilio Bossi, 3
20121 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Sama, Daniele, et al, et al
Sama Patents
Via Morgagni, 2
20129 Milano / IT
 02  12.02.1999  26.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Ecolab GmbH & Co. OHG, Patentabtlg., Geb. Z22/3.OG
Postfach 13 04 06
D- 40554 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Wacker, Manfred, et al, et al
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2002/48]
Opponent(s)01  11.02.1999  12.11.1999  WITHDRAWN
AUSIMONT S.p.A.
Piazetta Maurilio Bossi, 3
20121 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Sama, Daniele, Dr., et al, et al
Sama Patents Via Morgagni, 2
20129 Milano / IT
 02  12.02.1999  26.02.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Ecolab GmbH & Co. OHG, Patentabtlg., Geb. Z22/3.OG
Postfach 13 04 06
D- 40554 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Wacker, Manfred, Dr., et al, et al
Henkel KGaA, TTP / Patentabteilung
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1999/15]
Opponent(s)01  11.02.1999    WITHDRAWN
AUSIMONT S.p.A.
Piazetta Maurilio Bossi, 3
20121 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Sama, Daniele, Dr., et al, et al
Sama Patents Via Morgagni, 2
20129 Milano / IT
 02  12.02.1999   
Henkel-Ecolab GmbH & Co. oHG
Reisholzer Werftstrasse 38-42
40554 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Wacker, Manfred, Dr., et al, et al
Henkel KGaA, TTP / Patentabteilung
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
18.03.1999Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.07.1999Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.06.2000Date of oral proceedings
26.07.2000Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.07.2000Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
27.02.2003Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2003/22]
Appeal following opposition25.09.2000Appeal received No.  T0960/00
28.11.2000Statement of grounds filed
27.02.2003Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
27.02.2003Date of oral proceedings
06.03.2003Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
08.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.07.2002
SE02.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
NL01.02.2003
[2003/39]
Former [2003/37]AT01.07.2002
SE02.07.2002
NL01.02.2003
Former [2003/30]SE02.07.2002
NL01.02.2003
Former [2003/27]SE02.07.2002
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0170386  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]);
 [A]EP0260134  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US])
 [XD]  - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, 1962, Seiten 3821,3822, London, GB; K. BALENOVIC et al.: "Preparation of Some Peroxy-acids derived from Optically Active Amino-acids".
 [A]  - CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, Band 101, Nr. 1, 1968, Seiten 3957-3962; C. RUECHARDT et al.: "Alpha-Acylamino-percarbonsäure-tert.-butylester".
ExaminationEP0325288
 EP0325289
    - CHEMISCHE BERICHTE Band 101, Nr 1, 1968,Seiten 3957-3962; C. RUECHARDT et al.:"Alpha-Acylamino-percarbonsäure-tert.-butylester" * Seite 3958, Tabelle I *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.