blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0350020

EP0350020 - Fail-safe rear wheel steering system for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.1994
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.01.1995 [1995/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
No.2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama City / JP
[1990/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Eguchi, Takaaki
No. 1150-2, Takamori
Isehara City / JP
02 / Nakamura, Norimasa
No. 920-1
Zama City / JP
[1990/02]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/02]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date89112300.205.07.1989
[1990/02]
Priority number, dateJP1988016593205.07.1988         Original published format: JP 16593288
[1990/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0350020
Date:10.01.1990
Language:EN
[1990/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0350020
Date:02.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.1989
ClassificationIPC:B62D7/14, B62D5/30
[1990/02]
CPC:
B62D7/148 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1990/02]
TitleGerman:Ausfallsicheres Hinterradsteuerungssystem für Kraftfahrzeuge[1990/02]
English:Fail-safe rear wheel steering system for vehicle[1990/02]
French:Système de braquage des roues arrières pour véhicule avec système de sécurité[1994/05]
Former [1990/02]Système de craquage des roues arrières pour véhicule avec système de sécurité
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure05.07.1989Examination requested  [1990/02]
12.08.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.08.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.1993Fee for grant paid
22.10.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP59128055  ;
 [Y]JP59128054  ;
 [A]JP6185275  ;
 [A]GB2170457  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD);
 [A]FR2589419  (MOREAU ETS JEAN [FR]);
 [A]EP0225773  (LOTUS GROUP PLC [GB]);
 [E]EP0334723  (BENDIX FRANCE [FR])
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 253 (M-339)[1690], 20th November 1984; & JP-A-59 128 055 (MAZDA K.K.) 24-07-1984, & JP59128055 A 00000000
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 253 (M-339)[1690], 20th November 1984; & JP-A-59 128 054 (MAZDA K.K.) 24-07-1984, & JP59128054 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 261 (M-514)[2317], 5th November 1986; & JP-A-61 85 275 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP.) 30-04-1986, & JP6185275 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.