blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0350807

EP0350807 - Moulded foam panel and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  04.06.1999
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2010Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 21.04.2010  [2010/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C.A. GREINER & SÖHNE GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.
Greinerstrasse 70
4550 Kremsmünster / AT
[N/P]
Former [1993/28]For all designated states
C.A. GREINER & SÖHNE GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.
Greinerstrasse 70
A-4550 Kremsmünster / AT
Former [1990/03]For all designated states
SCHAUMSTOFFWERK GREINER GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.
Krift 5
A-4550 Kremsmünster / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Eder, Bernhard
Gaumbergstrasse 84a
A-4020 Linz a.d. Donau / AT
02 / Bürger, Hans
Fliederstrasse 10
A-4050 Traun / AT
03 / Reitinger, Franz
A-4112 Rottenegg Nr. 13 / AT
[1990/03]
Representative(s)Secklehner, Günter, et al
Rechtsanwalt, Pyhrnstrasse 1
8940 Liezen / AT
[N/P]
Former [1993/28]Secklehner, Günter, Dr., et al
Rechtsanwalt, Pyhrnstrasse 1
A-8940 Liezen / AT
Former [1990/03]Wolke, Heidemarie, Dr.
Stadtplatz 7
A-4400 Steyr / AT
Application number, filing date89112434.907.07.1989
[1990/03]
Priority number, dateAT1988000181114.07.1988         Original published format: AT 181188
[1990/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0350807
Date:17.01.1990
Language:DE
[1990/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0350807
Date:14.10.1992
Language:DE
[1992/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0350807
Date:20.11.1996
Language:DE
[1996/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.1992
ClassificationIPC:B29C44/00, B29C67/20, B29B17/00, // B29K103:00, B29K105:16, B29L31:58
[1996/47]
CPC:
B29B17/0042 (EP,US); B29C44/0446 (EP,US); B29C44/10 (EP,US);
B29C67/207 (EP,US); B29K2105/04 (EP,US); B29K2105/06 (EP,US);
B29K2105/16 (EP,US); B29K2105/253 (EP,US); Y02W30/62 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24488 (EP,US); Y10T428/24504 (EP,US); Y10T428/249981 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249982 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1990/03]B29C67/22, B29B17/00, // B29K103:00, B29K105:16, B29L31:58
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1990/03]
TitleGerman:Formteil aus Schaumstoffplatten und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[1990/03]
English:Moulded foam panel and method for its production[1990/03]
French:Panneau moulé en mousse et procédé pour sa fabrication[1990/03]
Examination procedure07.07.1989Examination requested  [1993/09]
28.12.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.08.1995Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
12.10.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.05.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.1996Fee for grant paid
16.08.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.08.1997  01.09.1997  ADMISSIBLE
HP-Chemie Pelzer Research and Development Ltd.
Industrial Estate
Waterford / IE
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 02  20.08.1997  29.03.2000  WITHDRAWN
Metzeler Schaum GmbH
Donaustrasse 51
87700 Memmingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Preissner, Nicolaus
Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 31 02 03
80102 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/16]
Opponent(s)01  13.08.1997  01.09.1997  ADMISSIBLE
HP-Chemie Pelzer Research and Development Ltd.
Industrial Estate
Waterford / IE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 02  20.08.1997  29.03.2000  WITHDRAWN
Metzeler Schaum GmbH
Donaustrasse 51
87700 Memmingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Preissner, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Ing.
Flügel Preissner Kastel Haimhauser Strasse 1
80802 München / DE
Former [2004/48]
Opponent(s)01  13.08.1997  01.09.1997  ADMISSIBLE
HP-Chemie Pelzer Research and Development Ltd.
Industrial Estate
Waterford / IE
Opponent's representative
Jönsson, Hans-Peter, Dr.Dipl.-Chem.
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
 02  20.08.1997  29.03.2000  WITHDRAWN
Metzeler Schaum GmbH
Donaustrasse 51
87700 Memmingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Preissner, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Ing.
Flügel Preissner Kastel Haimhauser Strasse 1
80802 München / DE
Former [1997/42]
Opponent(s)01  13.08.1997   
HP-Chemie Pelzer Research and Development Ltd.
Industrial Estate
Waterford / IE
Opponent's representative
Jönsson, Hans-Peter
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
 02  20.08.1997    WITHDRAWN
Metzeler Schaum GmbH
Donaustrasse 51
87700 Memmingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Preissner, Nicolaus
Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 03
80102 München / DE
Former [1997/41]
Opponent(s)01  13.08.1997   
HP-Chemie Pelzer Research and Development Ltd.
Industrial Estate
Waterford / IE
Opponent's representative
Jönsson, Hans-Peter
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
27.10.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.03.1998Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.01.1999Date of oral proceedings
18.01.1999Legal effect of revocation of patent [1999/29]
24.02.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.02.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition10.08.1999Appeal received No.  T0832/99
10.08.1999Statement of grounds filed
14.06.2002Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2002/24]
06.09.2002Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2002/36]
17.09.2004Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor inadmissible
Request for further processing for:12.10.1995Request for further processing filed
12.10.1995Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.10.1995Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
16.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
26.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2220616  (SCHWARZHEIDE SYNTHESEWERK VEB [DD]);
 [X]EP0118876  (BASF AG [DE]);
 [X]US4666646  (CHANG KUN H [TW]);
 [A]US4591469  (BUCHANAN MICHAEL S [US], et al);
 [AD]DE3627431  (GREINER SCHAUMSTOFFWERK [AT]);
 [A]DE2719714  (HIPPMANN WOLFGANG);
 [A]GB1147483  (MONSANTO CO [US]);
 [A]GB2040948  (ROTH SA FRERES);
 [Y]GB2163388  (STANKIEWICZ ALOIS DR GMBH);
 [Y]DE3534690  (GREINER & SOEHNE C A [DE]);
 [Y]DE2751774  (PELZER HELMUT);
 [Y]EP0177621  (KORK AG BOSWIL [CH]);
 [Y]US4330584  (DOERER RICHARD P);
 [Y]EP0208268  (IRBIT RESEARCH & CONSULTING AG [CH]);
 [Y]EP0146521  (MONSANTO CO [US]);
 [A]DE2556224  (PHOENIX GUMMIWERKE AG);
 [A]DE3403386  (POLYBREVETS & GESTION S A [CH]);
 [A]DE3623789  (PELZER HELMUT [DE]);
 [A]FR2126007  (KOEPP AG)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.