Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0410036

EP0410036 - Commodity information retrieval system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.10.1994
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YAMATO DENKI ENGINEERING KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-go, 1-ban, Nishitenma 5-chome Kita-ku
Osaka-shi / JP
[N/P]
Former [1991/05]For all designated states
YAMATO DENKI ENGINEERING KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-go, 1-ban, Nishitenma 5-chome Kita-ku
Osaka-shi / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamamoto, Eizo
13-banchi, Skuragaoka 3-chome
Mino-shi Osaka-fu / JP
02 / Maiki, Hayato
4-21, Kamo 2-chome
Takaishi-shi Osaka-fu / JP
[1991/05]
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [1991/11]Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. W. Döring
Postfach 30 24 30
D-20308 Hamburg / DE
Former [1991/05]Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. W. Döring
Neuer Wall 41
D-2000 Hamburg 36 / DE
Application number, filing date89113860.427.07.1989
[1991/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0410036
Date:30.01.1991
Language:EN
[1991/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.1990
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/40
[1991/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/05]
TitleGerman:Wiederauffindungssystem für geschäftliche Informationen[1991/05]
English:Commodity information retrieval system[1991/05]
French:Système de recherche d'informations commerciales[1991/05]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure07.08.1989Examination requested  [1991/05]
21.01.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.1994Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1994/47]
29.06.1994Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1994/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.199406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0207468  ;
 [A]US4266284  ;
 [A]US4064490
 [Y]  - S.M.P.T.E., vol. 94, no. 1, January 1985, pages 11-15; E. LEONARD: "Broadening video/graphics applications"
 [Y]  - SYSTEMS-COMPUTER-CONTROLS, vol. 11, no. 1, January-February 1980, pages 10-17; H. NAKAGAWA et al.: "Picture data base on-line remote access system"
 [A]  - IEEE TRANS. ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, vol. CE-26, no. 3, August 1980, pages 487-505; W.D. PIERCE et al.: "A low cost terminal for the 1980's: project green thumb"