Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0355738

EP0355738 - Fluorophotometer for use in automatic equipment of chemical analysis for measuring the intensity of fluorescence in the automatic equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1990/09]Fluorophotometer for use in automatic equipment of chemical analysis and method of measuring intensity of fluoroscence in the automatic equipment
[1994/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.1995
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1990/09]For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hashimoto, Hiroshi
1616, Toyooka Tokaimura
Naka-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP
02 / Umetsu, Hiroshi
2153-27, Tsuda
Katsuta-shi / JP
03 / Imai, Kyoko
Tsukubadai Apartment 1-103 663, Ichige
Katsuta-shi / JP
04 / Kawase, Masumi (née Suzuki)
RIO. 5-102 9-4-20, Suzuya
Yono-shi / JP
[1990/09]
Representative(s)Altenburg, Udo , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Altenburg, Udo , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [1990/09]Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1
D-81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date89115264.718.08.1989
[1990/09]
Priority number, dateJP1988021074726.08.1988         Original published format: JP 21074788
[1990/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0355738
Date:28.02.1990
Language:EN
[1990/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0355738
Date:27.02.1991
Language:EN
[1991/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0355738
Date:02.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.1991
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/64, G01N35/00
[1990/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1990/09]
TitleGerman:In einer automatischen Anlage für chemische Analysen angewendeter Fluorophotometer zur Messung der Fluoreszenzintensität in der automatischen Anlage[1994/44]
English:Fluorophotometer for use in automatic equipment of chemical analysis for measuring the intensity of fluorescence in the automatic equipment[1994/44]
French:Flurophotométre employé dans un équipment automatique pour analyse chimique pour mesurer l'intensité de fluorescence dans l'équipement automatique[1994/44]
Former [1990/09]In einer automatischen Anlage für chemische Analysen angewendeter Fluorophotometer und Verfahren zur Messung der Fluoreszenzintensität in der automatischen Anlage
Former [1990/09]Fluorophotometer for use in automatic equipment of chemical analysis and method of measuring intensity of fluoroscence in the automatic equipment
Former [1990/09]Fluorophotométre employé dans un équipement automatique pour analyse chimique et procédé pour mesurer l'intensité de fluorescence dans l'équipement automatique
Examination procedure18.08.1989Examination requested  [1990/09]
12.02.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.08.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.05.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.1994Fee for grant paid
15.07.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.08.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0198513  (HITACHI LTD [JP]);
 [Y]JPS6396540  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [A]US4622468  (STEFANSKI ANDREW [US], et al);
 [A]EP0197425  (ABBOTT LAB [US]);
 [A]US4291230  (HEISS LOUIS R);
 [AD]JPS638539  (SHIMADZU CORP);
 [A]US3551839  (BARKER GEORGE E)
 [A]  JOURNAL OF THE AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY, vol. 26, no. 10, October 1978, pages 739-771; B.A. BLESSER: "Digitization of audio: A comprehensive examination of theory, implementation, and current practice",
ExaminationJPH06396540