blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0375977

EP0375977 - Oxidation hairdyeing composition based upon diaminopyrazole derivatives, and these diaminopyrazole derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.1994
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.01.1995 [1995/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wella Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Allee 65
64295 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/27]For all designated states
Wella Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Allee 65
D-64295 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Clausen, Thomas, Dr.
Ernst-Pasqué-Strasse 35 A
D-6146 Alsbach / DE
02 / Kern, Ute, Dr.
Gehmerweg 9
D-6100 Darmstadt-Arheilgen / DE
03 / Neunhoeffer, Hans, Prof. Dr.
Auf dem Sand 1
D-6109 Mühltal / DE
[1990/27]
Application number, filing date89122091.530.11.1989
[1990/27]
Priority number, dateDE1988384389224.12.1988         Original published format: DE 3843892
[1990/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0375977
Date:04.07.1990
Language:DE
[1990/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0375977
Date:02.02.1994
Language:DE
[1994/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.1990
ClassificationIPC:C07D231/38, A61K7/13
[1990/27]
CPC:
A61Q5/10 (EP,US); A61K8/4953 (EP,US); C07D231/38 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1990/27]
TitleGerman:Oxidationshaarfärbemittel mit einem Gehalt an Diaminopyrazolderivaten und neue Diaminopyrazolderivate[1990/27]
English:Oxidation hairdyeing composition based upon diaminopyrazole derivatives, and these diaminopyrazole derivatives[1990/27]
French:Composition de coloration des cheveux par oxydation à base de dérivés de diaminopyrazole et des dérivés de diaminopyrazole[1990/27]
Examination procedure29.09.1990Examination requested  [1990/47]
14.10.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.03.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.1993Fee for grant paid
27.07.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
16.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2160318  (THERACHEMIE CHEM THERAPEUT);
 [AD]DE2160317  (THERACHEMIE CHEM THERAPEUT)
 [AD]  - JUSTUS LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, Band 707, 1967, Seiten 141-146, Weinheim, DE; H. DORN und H. DILCHER: "Über die elektrophile Substitution van 3(5)-Amino-pyrazol"
 [AD]  - JUSTUS LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, Band 717, 1968, Seiten 118-123, Weinheim, DE; H. DORN und H. DILCHER: "Synthese und Methylierung von 1H-Pyrazolo[3,4-b]pyrazinen, einer neuen Klasse von Purin-Antagonisten"
 [AD]  - CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, Band 101, Nr. 9, 1968, Seiten 3265-3277, Weinheim, DE; H. DORN und A. ZUBEK: "Potentielle Cytostatica, XVI. Bicyclische Systeme aus Acetessigester und 5-Amino-1-methyl-,5-Amino-1-benzyl sowie 3(5)-Amino-pyrazol"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.