Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0377837

EP0377837 - Floating point unit having simultaneous multiply and add [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.08.1996
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.09.1996 [1996/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1990/29]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Cocke, John
87 Pound Ridge Road
Bedford New York 10506 / US
02 / Montoye, Robert Kevin
6903 Mountain Trail
Austin Texas 78732 / US
[1990/29]
Representative(s)Schäfer, Wolfgang
IBM Deutschland
Informationssysteme GmbH
Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
70548 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/40]Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
D-70548 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1990/29]Jost, Ottokarl, Dipl.-Ing.
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
D-70548 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date89122891.812.12.1989
[1990/29]
Priority number, dateUS1989029701613.01.1989         Original published format: US 297016
[1990/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0377837
Date:18.07.1990
Language:EN
[1990/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0377837
Date:13.05.1992
Language:EN
[1992/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0377837
Date:04.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.1992
ClassificationInternational:G06F7/48
[1990/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1990/29]
TitleGerman:Gleitkommaeinheit mit gleichzeitiger Multiplikation und Addition[1990/29]
English:Floating point unit having simultaneous multiply and add[1990/29]
French:Unité à virgule flottante dans laquelle la multiplication et l'addition sont exécutées simultanément[1990/29]
Examination procedure13.11.1990Examination requested  [1991/02]
08.03.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.04.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.05.1995Fee for grant paid
22.05.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.07.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
19.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]  - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 30, no. 3, August 1987, NEW YORK US pages 986 - 987; 'Multiply-addition- an ultra high performance dataflow'