Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0382929

EP0382929 - Voltage regulator circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.1995
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.08.1995 [1995/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1990/34]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ito, Makoto c/o Intellectual Property Division
K.K. Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
[1990/34]
Representative(s)Lehn, Werner , et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
81904 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/34]Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Application number, filing date89123228.215.12.1989
[1990/34]
Priority number, dateJP1989003647916.02.1989         Original published format: JP 3647989
[1990/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0382929
Date:22.08.1990
Language:EN
[1990/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0382929
Date:26.09.1990
Language:EN
[1990/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0382929
Date:31.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.1990
ClassificationInternational:G05F3/20
[1990/34]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1990/34]
TitleGerman:Spannungsreglerschaltung[1990/34]
English:Voltage regulator circuit[1990/34]
French:Circuit régulateur de tension[1990/34]
Examination procedure15.12.1989Examination requested  [1990/34]
16.04.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.03.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.1994Fee for grant paid
26.05.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.06.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]JP61148860  ;
 [X]EP0024903  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]);
 [A]DE3814667  (SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR TELE [KR]);
 [A]EP0301184  (IBM [US]);
 [A]DE3704609  (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP])
 [A]  PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 347 (E-457)(2403) 21 October 1986, & JP-A-61 148860 (MITSUBISHI) 7 July 1986,,