Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0346986

EP0346986 - A zero IF receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  28.06.1995
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.1995Refusal of applicationpublished on 16.08.1995 [1995/33]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED
420-430 London Road
Croydon CR9 3QR / GB
For:DE  FR  IT  SE 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1989/51]For:GB 
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED
420-430 London Road
Croydon CR9 3QR / GB
For:DE  FR  IT  SE 
Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Cusdin, Anthony Richard
c/o Philips Research Laboratories Redhill
Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
[1989/51]
Representative(s)Moody, Colin James , et al
Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/02]Moody, Colin James , et al
Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
Former [1989/51]Moody, Colin James , et al
Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date89201505.812.06.1989
[1989/51]
Priority number, dateGB1988001441217.06.1988         Original published format: GB 8814412
[1989/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0346986
Date:20.12.1989
Language:EN
[1989/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0346986
Date:22.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.1991
ClassificationInternational:H03D1/22, H03D3/00, G01S3/48
[1990/52]
Former International [1989/51]H03D1/22, H03D3/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1989/51]
TitleGerman:Nullfrequenz-ZF-Empfänger[1989/51]
English:A zero IF receiver[1989/51]
French:Récepteur à fréquence intermédiaire zéro[1989/51]
File destroyed:03.03.2001
Examination procedure22.10.1992Examination requested  [1992/51]
12.07.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.08.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
22.03.1995Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/33]
01.04.1995Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2113930  (PLESSEY CO PLC);
 [Y]EP0074858  (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US]);
 [A]US3824595  (HALL S);
 [A]US4560941  (WELLES II KENNETH B [US], et al)