Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0327295

EP0327295 - Tetracycline dosage form [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.01.1993
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.1993Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.03.1993 [1993/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F.H. FAULDING & CO. LTD.
160 Greenhill Road Parkside
South Australia 5063 / AU
[N/P]
Former [1989/32]For all designated states
F.H. FAULDING & CO. LTD.
160 Greenhill Road
Parkside South Australia 5063 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / Morella, Angelo Mario
10 Seymour Grove
Campbelltown, South Australia / AU
02 / Fisher, Mark Christopher
80 Fletcher Road
Birkenhead South Australia / AU
03 / Dwyer, Mark
657 Milne Road
Banksia Park South Australia / AU
[1989/32]
Representative(s)Moon, Donald Keith , et al
BREWER & SON Quality House Quality Court Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1HT / GB
[1990/33]
Former [1989/32]Field, Roger Norton
Brewer & Son Quality House Quality Court Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1HT / GB
Application number, filing date89300900.131.01.1989
[1989/32]
Priority number, dateAU1988000651101.02.1988         Original published format: AU 651188
[1989/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0327295
Date:09.08.1989
Language:EN
[1989/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0327295
Date:06.09.1989
Language:EN
[1989/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.1989
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/52, A61K9/54, A61K31/65
[1989/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/32]
TitleGerman:Tetracyclin-Dosisform[1989/32]
English:Tetracycline dosage form[1989/32]
French:Forme de dosage de la tétracycline[1989/32]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure19.10.1989Examination requested  [1989/51]
21.02.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.08.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.10.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.09.1992Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1993/11]
13.10.1992Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1993/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US3499959  ;
 [X]FR2187290  ;
 [A]EP0185331