Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0382954

EP0382954 - Variable pressure earring clasp [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.08.1991
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.1991Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.10.1991 [1991/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tsamas, Anton
408 Kaplan Avenue Hackensack
New Jersey 07601 / US
[N/P]
Former [1990/34]For all designated states
Tsamas, Anton
408 Kaplan Avenue
Hackensack New Jersey 07601 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1990/34]
Representative(s)Spence, Anne , et al
FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Gables Massetts Road Horley
Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/34]Spence, Anne , et al
FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street
Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB
Application number, filing date89301366.414.02.1989
[1990/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0382954
Date:22.08.1990
Language:EN
[1990/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.11.1989
ClassificationInternational:A44C7/00
[1990/34]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [1990/34]
TitleGerman:Ohrringklemme mit verstellbarem Druck[1990/34]
English:Variable pressure earring clasp[1990/34]
French:Clip à pression variable pour boucle d'oreille[1990/34]
File destroyed:08.03.1999
Examination procedure23.02.1991Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1991/42]
21.05.1991Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1991/42]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
21.03.1991M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.199103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US3170212  ;
 [A]US1069225  ;
 [A]US2013760  ;
 [A]US2230984  ;
 [A]US2423905  ;
 [A]US2455236  ;
 [A]US2775014