Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0333410

EP0333410 - Screw-coupled connectors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.1992
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.1992Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 08.04.1992 [1992/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AB Electronic Components Limited
Abercynon Mountain Ash Mid-Glamorgan CF45 4SF
Wales / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/38]For all designated states
AB Electronic Components Limited
Abercynon
Mountain Ash Mid-Glamorgan CF45 4SF Wales / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Duncan, William Chambers Wilson
5 Georges Avenue
Bugbrooke Northampton NN7 3PW / GB
[1989/38]
Representative(s)Holliday, Frank
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/38]Holliday, Frank
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Field
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date89302453.913.03.1989
[1989/38]
Priority number, dateGB1988000591212.03.1988         Original published format: GB 8805912
[1989/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0333410
Date:20.09.1989
Language:EN
[1989/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0333410
Date:12.12.1990
Language:EN
[1990/50]
Former [1990/17]Type: A3  Search report
No.:EP0333410
Date:
Status:(deleted)
[1990/17]
[1990/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.1990
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/625
[1989/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1989/38]
TitleGerman:Verbinder mit Bajonettkupplung[1989/38]
English:Screw-coupled connectors[1989/38]
French:Connecteur à couplage à baionnette[1989/38]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure13.03.1991Examination requested  [1991/19]
14.02.1992Application withdrawn by applicant  [1992/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No searchDeclaration under Rule 45 EPC