blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0358296

EP0358296 - Yarn drawing-in nozzle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.1994
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.03.1994 [1994/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TEIJIN SEIKI CO. Ltd.
9-1 Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
[N/P]
Former [1990/11]For all designated states
TEIJIN SEIKI CO. Ltd.
9-1 Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nishimura, Yoshihide
679-4 Shusaku Masaki-cho Oaza
Iyo-gun Ehime-ken / JP
[1990/11]
Representative(s)Pacitti, Pierpaolo Alfonso, et al
Murgitroyd and Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/09]Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E., et al
Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Former [1990/11]Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E.
Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Application number, filing date89303993.321.04.1989
[1990/11]
Priority number, dateJP1988020506117.08.1988         Original published format: JP 20506188
[1990/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0358296
Date:14.03.1990
Language:EN
[1990/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0358296
Date:30.05.1990
Language:EN
[1990/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0358296
Date:10.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.1990
ClassificationIPC:D03J1/14
[1990/11]
CPC:
D03J1/14 (EP,KR)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [1990/11]
TitleGerman:Kettfaden-Einziehdüse[1990/11]
English:Yarn drawing-in nozzle[1990/11]
French:Tuyère de rentrage des fils de chaîne[1990/11]
Examination procedure05.06.1990Examination requested  [1990/32]
04.12.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.04.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.08.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.1992Fee for grant paid
23.09.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.12.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1994/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[APD]EP0295806  (TEIJIN SEIKI CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0158933  (TEIJIN SEIKI CO LTD [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.