blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0339976

EP0339976 - Anti-tumour agents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.1994
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.01.1995 [1995/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC
Imperial Chemical House, Millbank
London SW1P 3JF / GB
For all designated states
NATIONAL RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION
101 Newington Causeway
London SE1 6BU / GB
[1989/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Hughes, Leslie Richard
11 Clarendon Drive
Macclesfield Cheshire, SK10 2QQ / GB
02 / Oldfield, John
68 Hallwood Road
Handforth Wilmslow Cheshire / GB
03 / Pegg, Stephen John
22 Appleby Close
Macclesfield Cheshire, SK11 8XB / GB
[1989/44]
Representative(s)Tait, Brian Steele, et al
Intellectual Property Department ZENECA Pharmaceuticals Mereside Alderley Park
Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/02]Tait, Brian Steele, et al
Intellectual Property Department ZENECA Pharmaceuticals Mereside Alderley Park
Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
Former [1993/14]Tait, Brian Steele
ICI Group Patents Service Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road
Welwyn Garden City Herts AL7 1HD / GB
Former [1989/44]Slatcher, Reginald Peter
ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road
Welwyn Garden City, Herts, AL7 1HD / GB
Application number, filing date89304166.526.04.1989
[1989/44]
Priority number, dateGB1988000997827.04.1988         Original published format: GB 8809978
[1989/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0339976
Date:02.11.1989
Language:EN
[1989/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0339976
Date:02.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.1989
ClassificationIPC:C07D239/88, C07D239/90, C07D239/96, A61K31/505
[1989/44]
CPC:
C07D239/90 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (EP); C07D239/88 (EP,US);
C07D239/96 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [1993/31]
Former [1989/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Antitumormittel[1989/44]
English:Anti-tumour agents[1989/44]
French:Agents antitumeurs[1989/44]
Examination procedure23.11.1989Examination requested  [1990/03]
29.07.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.07.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.1993Fee for grant paid
28.07.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
06.03.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0204529  (BRITISH TECH GROUP [GB]);
 [A]EP0239362  (ICI PLC [GB], et al);
 [A]GB2188319  (ICI PLC, et al);
 [AP]EP0284338  (ICI PLC [GB], et al)
ExaminationWO8904307
 EP0316657
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.