Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0342910 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0342910



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 611
08.07.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
26.11.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.11.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 6
19.11.2003 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
14.11.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.11.2003 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
10.11.2003 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
07.11.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.11.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
05.11.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.11.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.11.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.11.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.09.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.09.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.09.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
10.09.2003 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
28.07.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.07.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
18.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.03.2003 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.03.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 28
11.03.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
21.01.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.01.2003 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
20.01.2003 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
13.01.2003 Notice of appeal/statement of grounds Appeal 1
10.01.2003 Notice of appeal/statement of grounds Appeal 2
20.11.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.11.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.11.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.11.2002 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 3
11.11.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 6
05.11.2002 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
05.11.2002 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
05.11.2002 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.11.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.11.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.10.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.10.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.10.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.09.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.07.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
13.06.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.06.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
11.06.2002 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
11.06.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
11.06.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
11.06.2002 Text intended for grant Opposition 6
21.05.2002 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.12.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.11.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.10.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.10.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
03.09.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.08.2001 Description Opposition 3
21.08.2001 Drawings Opposition 1
21.08.2001 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.08.2001 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 7
18.06.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.06.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.06.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.03.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
19.03.2001 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
09.03.2001 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
18.07.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.07.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
02.06.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.05.2000 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
16.05.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.05.2000 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
13.04.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
13.04.2000 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
06.04.2000 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
24.03.2000 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.02.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
29.02.2000 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 4
23.02.2000 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
10.11.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.11.1999 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
29.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.09.1999 Description Opposition 5
18.09.1999 Drawings Opposition 1
18.09.1999 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
16.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.09.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.09.1999 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
31.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.08.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
26.08.1999 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
02.07.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
02.07.1999 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
16.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.02.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
12.01.1999 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
09.12.1998 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
24.11.1998 Claims Opposition 3
24.11.1998 Description Opposition 5
24.11.1998 Drawings Opposition 1
24.11.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.09.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.09.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
17.09.1998 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.08.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.08.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.07.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
21.07.1998 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
21.07.1998 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.07.1998 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.05.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
20.04.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
19.12.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.12.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
11.12.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
19.11.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.11.1997 Claims Opposition 2
12.11.1997 Claims Opposition 2
12.11.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.10.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
21.10.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
21.10.1997 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
21.10.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
10.10.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.09.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.09.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.09.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
10.09.1997 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
10.09.1997 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.09.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.09.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.06.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.06.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.05.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.05.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
15.01.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.12.1996 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
19.09.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
19.09.1996 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
19.08.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
08.08.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
08.08.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
08.08.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
08.08.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
08.08.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.09.1995 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
11.08.1995 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.08.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
11.08.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
10.05.1995 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
28.04.1995 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
18.01.1995 Text intended for grant Search / examination 50
08.01.1995 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
04.01.1995 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
20.10.1994 Claims Search / examination 5
20.10.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.09.1994 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
27.09.1994 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
21.09.1994 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.08.1994 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.08.1994 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.04.1994 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
02.03.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.01.1994 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.12.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.09.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
09.08.1993 Claims Search / examination 1
09.08.1993 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.07.1993 Claims Search / examination 5
19.07.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
16.06.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.06.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.02.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
20.11.1992 Claims Search / examination 5
20.11.1992 Description Search / examination 4
20.11.1992 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.07.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
05.06.1990 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.06.1990 European search report Search / examination 2
03.07.1989 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
03.07.1989 Priority document Search / examination 25
03.07.1989 Priority document Search / examination 53
16.05.1989 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.05.1989 Authorisation Search / examination 1
16.05.1989 Description Search / examination 24
16.05.1989 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.05.1989 Drawings Search / examination 7
16.05.1989 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
10.05.1989 Claims Search / examination 3