blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0346048

EP0346048 - Silver master plate recovery solution [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.11.1993
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.01.1994 [1994/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nikken Chemical Laboratory Co, Ltd.
16-1 Sakae, 2-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1989/50]For all designated states
Nikken Chemical Laboratory Co, Ltd.
16-1 Sakae, 2-chome
Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshida, Hajime
No. 5 Yamamoto-201 310, Aza-Bancho Ohaza-Ichiba
Kiyosu-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Kamada, Tokuichi
4-22, Kitazono-doori Ichinomiya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Kainuma, Osamu
1053, Kumaiden Tomita-cho Nakagawa-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP
[1989/50]
Representative(s)Taylor, Phillip Kenneth, et al
W.P. Thompson & Co.
Coopers Building
Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/50]Taylor, Phillip Kenneth, et al
W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date89305661.405.06.1989
[1989/50]
Priority number, dateJP1988014257709.06.1988         Original published format: JP 14257788
[1989/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0346048
Date:13.12.1989
Language:EN
[1989/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0346048
Date:21.03.1990
Language:EN
[1990/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0346048
Date:27.01.1993
Language:EN
[1993/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.1990
ClassificationIPC:B41N3/08, G03F7/06
[1990/13]
CPC:
G03F7/063 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1989/50]B41N3/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1989/50]
TitleGerman:Lipophilisierungslösung für Flachdruckplatten mit Silbersalzen[1989/50]
English:Silver master plate recovery solution[1989/50]
French:Solution de lipophilisation pour plaques lithographiques aux sels d'argent[1989/50]
Examination procedure12.07.1990Examination requested  [1990/36]
15.04.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.07.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.1992Fee for grant paid
28.09.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.10.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1994/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
09.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JP63063643  ;
 [XP]JP01014924  ;
 [Y]CH436355  (KALLE AG [DE]);
 [A]GB1190855  (ILFORD LTD)
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 109, no. 8, 22 August 1988 Columbus, Ohio, USA page 657; ref. no. 64360U & JP-A-63 063 643(Moses Lake Industies,Inc.)(22.03. 1988), & JP63063643 A 19880822
 [XP]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 110, no. 24, 12 June 1989 Columbus, Ohio, USA page 659; ref. no. 24111E & JP-A-01 014 924(Mitsubishi Gas Chem.Co.)(19.01.19 89), & JP01014924 A 19890612
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.