Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0346158

EP0346158 - Headliner and sunshade fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.1994
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.02.1995 [1995/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE, Inc.
5200 Auto Club Drive Dearborn
Michigan 48126 / US
[N/P]
Former [1989/50]For all designated states
UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE, Inc.
5200 Auto Club Drive
Dearborn Michigan 48126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dowd, James D.
3587 Congress Road
Farmington Hill Michigan 48018 / US
02 / Hilborn, David M.
8439 Hickory
Sterling Heights Michigan 48077 / US
03 / Weilant, Roy
5076 Timber Ridge Trail
Clarkston Michigan 48016 / US
04 / Lawassani, Abdolossein R.
845 Sheryl
Pontiac Michigan 48054 / US
[1989/50]
Representative(s)Gilding, Martin John , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/50]Gilding, Martin John , et al
Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate
Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB
Application number, filing date89305921.212.06.1989
[1989/50]
Priority number, dateUS1988020480410.06.1988         Original published format: US 204804
[1989/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0346158
Date:13.12.1989
Language:EN
[1989/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0346158
Date:30.01.1991
Language:EN
[1991/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0346158
Date:16.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.1990
ClassificationInternational:B60R13/02
[1989/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1989/50]
TitleGerman:Befestiger für Dachhimmel und Sonnenblende[1989/50]
English:Headliner and sunshade fastener[1989/50]
French:Fixation pour revêtement de toît et pare-soleil[1989/50]
Examination procedure12.07.1991Examination requested  [1991/37]
12.02.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.08.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.1993Fee for grant paid
11.11.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.11.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
09.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0088931  ;
 [A]DE3636364  ;
 [A]DE3442877  ;
 [A]US4352522