Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0349316

EP0349316 - Vehicle fleet fuel monitoring system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.1992
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 12.06.2002  [2002/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ai CAMBRIDGE LIMITED
London Road Pampisford
Cambridge CB2 4EF / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/09]For all designated states
Ai CAMBRIDGE LIMITED
London Road
Pampisford Cambridge CB2 4EF / GB
Former [1990/01]For all designated states
ANALYTICAL INSTRUMENTS LIMITED
London Road
Pampisford Cambridge CB2 4EF / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Lamont, Iain Andrew James
13 Painter Wood Billington
Blackburn Lancashire / GB
02 / Finch, Stuart Darryl
20 Whalley Road Wiltshire
Blackburn Lancashire / GB
[1990/01]
Representative(s)Huntingford, David Ian , et al
Geoffrey Owen & Company 76 Lower Bridge Street
Chester CH1 1RU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/01]Huntingford, David Ian , et al
Geoffrey Owen & Company 76 Lower Bridge Street
Chester CH1 1RU / GB
Application number, filing date89306602.729.06.1989
[1990/01]
Priority number, dateGB1988001558430.06.1988         Original published format: GB 8815584
[1990/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0349316
Date:03.01.1990
Language:EN
[1990/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0349316
Date:22.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.1989
ClassificationInternational:B67D5/08, B67D5/32
[1990/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1990/01]
TitleGerman:Einrichtung zur Kraftstoffüberwachung eines Fahrzeugparks[1990/01]
English:Vehicle fleet fuel monitoring system[1990/01]
French:Système de gestion de carburant d'un parc automobile[1990/01]
Examination procedure08.01.1990Examination requested  [1990/10]
14.03.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.07.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.1991Fee for grant paid
17.10.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.10.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1993/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.01.1992
CH22.01.1992
ES22.01.1992
GR22.01.1992
LI22.01.1992
SE22.01.1992
LU30.06.1992
[2002/24]
Former [2000/04]AT22.01.1992
CH22.01.1992
GR22.01.1992
LI22.01.1992
SE22.01.1992
LU30.06.1992
Former [1999/52]AT22.01.1992
CH22.01.1992
LI22.01.1992
SE22.01.1992
LU30.06.1992
Former [1992/46]AT22.01.1992
CH22.01.1992
LI22.01.1992
SE22.01.1992
Former [1992/33]CH22.01.1992
LI22.01.1992
SE22.01.1992
Former [1992/32]SE22.01.1992
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0068747  (MONITRONIX SYST [GB]);
 [AD]DE3438939  (DEUTSCHE GERAETEBAU GMBH);
 [A]GB2147273  (GREEN DONALD, et al)