Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0351201

EP0351201 - Non-shrinkable hybrid yarn [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.01.1992
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.1992Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.03.1992 [1992/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST CELANESE CORPORATION
Route 202-206 North
Somerville, N.J. 08876 / US
[1990/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Ying, Edwina
266 Holland Court
Bridgewater New Jersey / US
[1990/03]
Representative(s)De Minvielle-Devaux, Ian Benedict Peter , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
[1990/03]
Application number, filing date89307059.912.07.1989
[1990/03]
Priority number, dateUS1988021840113.07.1988         Original published format: US 218401
[1990/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0351201
Date:17.01.1990
Language:EN
[1990/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0351201
Date:09.01.1991
Language:EN
[1991/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1990
ClassificationInternational:D02G3/04, D02G3/40
[1991/09]
Former International [1990/03]D02G3/04
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1990/03]
TitleGerman:Nichtschrumpffähiges Mischgarn[1990/03]
English:Non-shrinkable hybrid yarn[1990/03]
French:Fil mixte non rétrécissable[1990/03]
File destroyed:15.03.1999
Examination procedure10.07.1991Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1992/11]
11.10.1991Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1992/11]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
14.08.1991M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.199103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0226420  ;
 [A]EP0156600  ;
 [AD]DE3341292  ;
 [AD]GB2067612  ;
 [A]US3029590