Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0353037

EP0353037 - Bistable semiconductor laser diode device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.1997
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.09.1997 [1997/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1990/05]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Odagawa, Tetsufumi
Copo Ide 202, 123-1, Kamigo
Ebina-shi Kanagawa 243-04 / JP
[1990/05]
Representative(s)Skone James, Robert Edmund , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/05]Skone James, Robert Edmund , et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date89307575.425.07.1989
[1990/05]
Priority number, dateJP1988018892528.07.1988         Original published format: JP 18892588
JP1989000623413.01.1989         Original published format: JP 623489
[1990/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0353037
Date:31.01.1990
Language:EN
[1990/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0353037
Date:12.09.1990
Language:EN
[1990/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0353037
Date:18.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.1990
ClassificationInternational:H01S3/103, G02F3/00
[1990/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1990/05]
TitleGerman:Bistabile Halbleiterlaser-Vorrichtung[1990/05]
English:Bistable semiconductor laser diode device[1990/05]
French:Dispositif laser à semi-conducteur bistable[1990/05]
Examination procedure28.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/10]
01.12.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
11.12.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.02.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.05.1996Fee for grant paid
17.05.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
07.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
11.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
11.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]  - JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, vol. LT-4, no. 7, July 1986, pages 894-899, IEEE, New York, US; S. SUZUKI et al.: "An experiment on high-speed optical time-division switching"
 [A]  - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, vol. 23, no. 10, 7th May 1987, pages 532-534, Hitchin, Herts, GB; H.-F. LIU et al.: "Proposal of an optical triggering scheme for bistable semiconductor lasers: Combination with photoconductors"
 [A]  - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, vol. 19, no. 14, July 1983, pages 558-560, London, GB; I.H. WHITE et al.: "Room-temperature optically triggered bistability in twinstripe lasers"
 [A]  - IEE PROCEEDINGS SECTION A à I, vol. 133, no. 4, part J, August 1986, pages 283-292, Stevenage, Herts, GB; M.C. PERKINS et al.: "Analysis of absorptive bistable characteristics of multisegment lasers"
 [XP]  - EXTENDED ABSTRACTS OF THE 20TH (1988 INTERNATIONAL) CONFERENCE ON SOLID STATE DEVICES AND MATERIALS, Tokyo, 24th - 26th August 1988, pages 331-334; T. ODAGAWA et al.: "All optical flip-flop operation of bistable laser diode"