Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0353064

EP0353064 - Method and apparatus for feeding a plurality of molten resin jet streams into T die [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.11.1997
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.01.1998 [1998/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOMY MACHINERY MANUFACTURING COMPANY LIMITED
16-4 Koyama 4-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1990/05]For all designated states
TOMY MACHINERY MANUFACTURING COMPANY LIMITED
16-4 Koyama 4-chome
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shinmoto, Jitsumi
16-4, Koyama 4-chome
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP
[1990/05]
Representative(s)Pacitti, Pierpaolo Alfonso , et al
Murgitroyd and Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/09]Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E. , et al
Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Former [1990/05]Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E.
Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Application number, filing date89307644.827.07.1989
[1990/05]
Priority number, dateJP1988018759827.07.1988         Original published format: JP 18759888
[1990/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0353064
Date:31.01.1990
Language:EN
[1990/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0353064
Date:03.04.1991
Language:EN
[1991/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0353064
Date:15.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.1991
ClassificationInternational:B29C47/06, B29C47/14, B29C47/58
[1991/19]
Former International [1990/05]B29C47/06, B29C47/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1990/05]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Fördern einer Mehrzahl von geschmolzenen Harzstrahlen in eine T-Matrize[1990/05]
English:Method and apparatus for feeding a plurality of molten resin jet streams into T die[1990/05]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour alimenter une filière en T par une pluralité de courants de résines fondues[1990/05]
Examination procedure26.09.1991Examination requested  [1991/48]
08.03.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.09.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
01.07.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.03.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.07.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.1996Fee for grant paid
30.09.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.10.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
19.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
24.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
23.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US3909170  (RIBOULET ROBERT, et al);
 [X]USRE27769E  ;
 [A]US3443277  (FRIELINGSDORF HANS);
 [A]DE1479111  (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG);
 [A]US4051293  (WILEY DONALD F);
 [A]US3825383  (HOAGLAND J, et al);
 [A]US4731004  (WENZ JR HERBERT J [US]);
 [A]US4082488  (BRINKSCHRODER FRANZ-JURGEN, et al)