Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0356059

EP0356059 - Process for doping crystals of wide band gap semiconductors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neumark, Gertrude F.
153 Old Colony Road Hartsdale
New York 10530 / US
[N/P]
Former [1990/09]For all designated states
Neumark, Gertrude F.
153 Old Colony Road
Hartsdale New York 10530 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1990/09]
Representative(s)Allam, Peter Clerk , et al
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/09]Allam, Peter Clerk , et al
LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand
London WC2R 0AE / GB
Application number, filing date89308007.707.08.1989
[1990/09]
Priority number, dateUS1988023240515.08.1988         Original published format: US 232405
US1988023480222.08.1988         Original published format: US 234802
[1990/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0356059
Date:28.02.1990
Language:EN
[1990/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0356059
Date:02.05.1990
Language:EN
[1990/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0356059
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.1990
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/38, H01L21/477, H01L33/00
[1990/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1990/09]
TitleGerman:Dotierungsverfahren für Halbleiterkristalle mit grosser Bandlücke[1990/09]
English:Process for doping crystals of wide band gap semiconductors[1990/09]
French:Procédé pour doper des cristaux semi-conducteurs à large bande interdite[1990/09]
Examination procedure25.10.1990Examination requested  [1990/51]
15.07.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.1999Date of oral proceedings
03.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
03.03.1999Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
23.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.1999Fee for grant paid
21.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99102455.5   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 09.03.1999
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
09.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
17.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
23.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 09
27.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 10
21.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[A]JP63160344  ;
 [XP]FR2613136  (JAPAN INCUBATOR INC [JP], et al)
 [A]  SEMICONDUCTOR SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, vol. 2, no. 10, October 1987, pages 629-635, IOP Publishing Ltd, Bristol, GB; F. EL. AKKAD: "Lithium and phosphorus impurities in ZnTe",
 [A]  JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 42, no. 7, June 1971, pages 2919-2924; B. TELL: "Properties of the alkalis in CdS",
 [A]  JOURNAL OF ELECTRONIC MATERIAL, vol. 5, no. 1, February 1976, pages 23-35, Plenum Publishing Corp., New York, US; Z.K. KUN et al.: "Some characteristics of the formation of high conductivity P-layers in ZnSe and ZnSxSe1-x,
 [A]  PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 423 (E-680), 9th November 1988; & JP-A-63 160 344 (TOSHIBA CORP.) 04-07-1988,
 [A]  APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 52, no. 1, 4th January 1988, pages 57-59, American Institute of Physics; T. YASUDA et al.: "Metalorganic vapor phase epitaxy of low-resistivity p-type ZnSe",