blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0360499

EP0360499 - Analog-to-digital converter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.1996
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.1997Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 15.10.1997 [1997/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1990/13]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Herbst, Gary Alan
29 Southlake Drive
San Jose, CA 95138 / US
02 / Jones, David Michael
8670 Del Rey Court
Gilroy, CA 95020 / US
[1990/13]
Representative(s)Moss, Robert Douglas
IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Department
Hursley Park
Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/13]Moss, Robert Douglas
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date89309358.314.09.1989
[1990/13]
Priority number, dateUS1988024746921.09.1988         Original published format: US 247469
[1990/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0360499
Date:28.03.1990
Language:EN
[1990/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0360499
Date:03.06.1992
Language:EN
[1992/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0360499
Date:20.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.1992
ClassificationIPC:H03M1/14, H03M1/36
[1990/13]
CPC:
H03M1/368 (EP,US); H03M1/1019 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1990/13]
TitleGerman:Analog-Digitalwandler[1990/13]
English:Analog-to-digital converter[1990/13]
French:Convertisseur analogique-numérique[1990/13]
Examination procedure23.07.1990Examination requested  [1990/38]
25.08.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.06.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.1995Fee for grant paid
27.06.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.09.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
18.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
07.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB14.09.1996
[1997/42]
Documents cited:Search[X]  - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS. vol. 32, no. 4, November 1986, NEW YORK US pages 734 - 741; ISO ET AL.: '16-bit a/d converter and d/a converter for digital audio'
 [A]  - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT. vol. 34, no. 4, December 1985, NEW YORK US pages 630 - 635; S.M.R.TAHA: 'Speed improvements for dual-slope a/d converters'
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.