blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0363151

EP0363151 - Prosthetic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1990/15]Prosthetic device and method of implantation
[1995/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.1996
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.12.1996 [1996/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOWMEDICA INC.
235 East 42nd Street New York
New York 10017 / US
[N/P]
Former [1993/20]For all designated states
HOWMEDICA INC.
235 East 42nd Street
New York New York 10017 / US
Former [1990/15]For all designated states
Pfizer Hospital Products Group, Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York New York 10017 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Noble, Philip C.
2147 Swift Boulevard
Houston Texas / US
02 / Padgett, Mary Beth
58 Canton Road
Parsippany New Jersey / US
[1990/15]
Representative(s)Hayles, James Richard, et al
Pfizer
ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR
[N/P]
Former [1995/27]Hayles, James Richard, et al
Pfizer Limited, Patents Department, Ramsgate Road
Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Former [1990/15]Bradbrook, Geoffrey William
PFIZER LIMITED Ramsgate Road
Sandwich Kent, CT13 9NJ / GB
Application number, filing date89310099.003.10.1989
[1990/15]
Priority number, dateUS1988025520607.10.1988         Original published format: US 255206
[1990/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0363151
Date:11.04.1990
Language:EN
[1990/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0363151
Date:18.03.1992
Language:EN
[1992/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0363151
Date:20.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.1992
ClassificationIPC:A61F2/30, A61F2/36
[1990/15]
CPC:
A61F2/30771 (EP,US); A61F2/30724 (EP,US); A61F2/36 (EP,US);
A61B17/1659 (EP,US); A61F2/367 (EP,US); A61F2/3676 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30112 (EP,US); A61F2002/30113 (EP,US); A61F2002/30158 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3021 (EP,US); A61F2002/30235 (EP,US); A61F2002/30332 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30738 (EP,US); A61F2002/308 (EP,US); A61F2002/30827 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30828 (EP,US); A61F2002/30919 (EP,US); A61F2002/30978 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US); A61F2230/0004 (EP,US); A61F2230/0006 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0026 (EP,US); A61F2230/0067 (EP,US); A61F2230/0069 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00017 (EP,US); A61F2310/00023 (EP,US); A61F2310/00029 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00179 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1990/15]
TitleGerman:Protheseneinrichtung[1995/51]
English:Prosthetic device[1995/51]
French:Dispositif prothétique[1995/51]
Former [1990/15]Protheseneinrichtung und Verfahren zur Implantation
Former [1990/15]Prosthetic device and method of implantation
Former [1990/15]Dispositif prothétique et procédé d'implantation
Examination procedure16.10.1989Examination requested  [1990/15]
16.08.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.07.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.03.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.05.1995Fee for grant paid
29.05.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.09.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
16.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
10.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2607315  (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP);
 [A]FR2583286  (BOTTON GERARD DE [FR]);
 [A]US4636219  (PRATT CLYDE R [US], et al);
 [A]EP0241846  (NEW YORK SOCIETY [US]);
 [A]US4714470  (WEBB JR JOHN D [US], et al)
ExaminationDE2220304
 EP0153523
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.