Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0364216

EP0364216 - Screening and monitoring instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.11.1996
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 26.01.2000 [2000/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GYRUS MEDICAL LIMITED
Fountain Lane, St. Mellons
Cardiff CF3 0LX / GB
[1995/24]
Former [1990/16]For all designated states
GYRUS MEDICAL LIMITED
Churchill House Churchill Way
Cardiff CF1 4XQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Goble, Nigel Mark
Chapel Cottage Milton Combe
Yelverton Devon PL20 6HP / GB
02 / Goble, Colin Charles Owen
4, Baker's Court Clive Road
Canton Cardiff CF5 4HJ / GB
[1990/16]
Representative(s)Harrison, Ivor Stanley , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/16]Harrison, Ivor Stanley , et al
Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn
London EC1N 2JT / GB
Application number, filing date89310355.610.10.1989
[1990/16]
Priority number, dateGB1988002400113.10.1988         Original published format: GB 8824001
GB1989000719330.03.1989         Original published format: GB 8907193
[1990/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0364216
Date:18.04.1990
Language:EN
[1990/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0364216
Date:17.01.1996
Language:EN
[1996/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.01.1990
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/20
[1990/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1990/16]
TitleGerman:Überprüfungs- und Überwachungsinstrument[1990/16]
English:Screening and monitoring instrument[1990/16]
French:Instrument de diagnostic et de surveillance[1990/16]
Examination procedure15.10.1990Examination requested  [1990/50]
06.08.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.11.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.04.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.1995Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
25.09.1995Fee for grant paid
25.09.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.10.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1997/02]
Request for further processing for:20.09.1995Request for further processing filed
25.09.1995Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.10.1995Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR17.01.1996
[2000/04]
Documents cited:Search[A]JP60233551  ;
 [A]JP6150065  ;
 [A]EP0251931  (TERUMO CORP [JP]);
 [A]AT376117B  (PROHASKA OTTO [AT]);
 [A]US3635213  (LAHAY JAMES F)
 [X]  - MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 11, no. 4, July 1973, pages 480-488, Stevenage, Herts, GB; R. MERLETTI et al.: "Instrumentation for the maintenance of an open-loop condition in the body-fluid volume-control system of small laboratory animals and for the automatic recording of urine flow and conductivity during antidiuretic-hormone bioassay"
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 101 (P-447)[2158], 17th April 1986; & JP-A-60 233 551 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 20-11-1985, & JP60233551 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 210 (P-479)[2266], 23rd July 1986; & JP-A-61 50 065 (TOA DENPA KOGYO K.K.) 12-03-1986, & JP6150065 A 00000000