blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0368539

EP0368539 - Umbrella frame [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  19.06.1998
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hoyland Fox Limited
Penistone
Sheffield S30 6NR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/20]For all designated states
HOYLAND FOX LIMITED
Penistone
Sheffield S30 6NR / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Earnshaw, John Michael
45 Middlecliffe Drive
Crowedge Sheffield S30 5HB / GB
02 / Bly, Michael Harold
Hill Top Farm Hill Top Bank
New Mill Huddersfield HD7 7DN / GB
[1990/20]
Representative(s)Bedggood, Guy Stuart, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/20]Bedggood, Guy Stuart, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Application number, filing date89311251.631.10.1989
[1990/20]
Priority number, dateGB1988002620909.11.1988         Original published format: GB 8826209
GB1989000108618.01.1989         Original published format: GB 8901086
[1990/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0368539
Date:16.05.1990
Language:EN
[1990/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0368539
Date:24.10.1990
Language:EN
[1990/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0368539
Date:05.01.1994
Language:EN
[1994/01]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0368539
Date:05.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.1990
ClassificationIPC:A45B17/00
[1990/20]
CPC:
A45B17/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1990/20]
TitleGerman:Schirmgestell[1990/20]
English:Umbrella frame[1990/20]
French:Armature de parapluie[1990/20]
Examination procedure11.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/06]
01.06.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.09.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.07.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.1993Fee for grant paid
30.09.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.03.1994  15.03.1994  ADMISSIBLE
Kortenbach Verwaltungs- und Beteiligungsgesellschaft mbH & Co.
Weyerstrasse 277
D-42719 Solingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Beyer, Rudi
Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rudi Beyer
Am Dickelsbach 8
40883 Ratingen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1994/17]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.1994  15.03.1994  ADMISSIBLE
Kortenbach Verwaltungs- und Beteiligungsgesellschaft mbH & Co.
Weyerstrasse 277
D-42719 Solingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Beyer, Rudi
Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rudi Beyer Am Dickelsbach 8
D-40883 Ratingen / DE
08.11.1994Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.04.1995Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.04.1995Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
23.06.1995Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
18.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M05)
11.05.1996Reply to a communication from the opposition division
01.12.1997Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.12.1997Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.03.1998Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
28.05.1998Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition14.01.1997Appeal received No.  T0063/97
22.02.1997Statement of grounds filed
01.12.1997Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
01.12.1997Date of oral proceedings
11.12.1997Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH05.01.1994
LI05.01.1994
LU31.10.1994
[2000/06]
Former [1994/31]CH05.01.1994
LI05.01.1994
Documents cited:Search[A]FR750914  ;
 [A]US2605778  (CLAPPER CLYDE E);
 [A]FR1456197
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.